This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2018 at 07:59:43 (UTC).

Moorman, Daryl v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Moorman, Daryl filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00820

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daryl L. Moorman

Defendants

Charter Communications, Inc.

Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC

Charter Communications, LLC

TWC Administration, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Modl

Attorney at Axley Brynelson, LLP

Two East Mifflin Street, Ste. 200, P.O. Box 1767

Madison, WI 53701

Heath P. Straka

Attorney at Gingras, Cates & Luebke, S.C.

8150 Excelsior Dr.

Madison, WI 53717

Robert John Gingras

Attorney at Gingras, Cates & Luebke, S.C.

8150 Excelsior Dr.

Madison, WI 53717

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent Form

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Charter Communications, Inc.

1 #4

Summons Charter Communications, LLC

1 #5

Summons Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC

1 #6

Summons TWC Administration, LLC

#2

2 #1

Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, LLC

2 #2

Summons Issued as to Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC

2 #3

Summons Issued as to TWC Administration, LLC

#3

#4

#5

#6

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Returned Executed. TWC Administration, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Modl, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Returned Executed. Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Modl, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Returned Executed. Charter Communications, Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Modl, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Returned Executed. Charter Communications, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Modl, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC, #3 Summons Issued as to TWC Administration, LLC) (kwf) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2332167.), filed by Daryl L. Moorman, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent Form, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Charter Communications, Inc., #4 Summons - Charter Communications, LLC, #5 Summons - Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC, #6 Summons - TWC Administration, LLC) (Modl, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM MANAGEMENT HOLDING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TWC ADMINISTRATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heath P. Straka