This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2018 at 07:01:57 (UTC).

Moore v. U. S. Bank National Association

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Moore filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05578

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Appellant

Teresa Jean Moore

Mountain View, CA 94042

Appellees

Mike Aleali

Sigfredo G. Ponce

U. S. Bank National Association

Leslie M. Klott

NBS Default Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Erin M McCartney

30 Corporate Park, Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92606

Michael L. Smith

333 Bush Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Mark R Wilson

Attorney at Manning and Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

333 Bush Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Timothy Matthew Ryan

Attorney at The Ryan Firm

30 Corporate Park, Suite 310

Irvine, CA 92606

Nabeel M. Zuberi

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLP

301 E. Ocean Boulevard, Suite 1720

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER/JUDGMENT. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

4 #4

Appellant Designation part 2

4 #3

Appellant Designation part 1

4 #2

docket sheet

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/ by Teresa Jean Moore. (Attachments: #1 certificate of record, #2 docket sheet, #3 Appellant Designation part 1, #4 Appellant Designation part 2)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Wilson (Wilson, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

2 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #5

Judgment

1 #4

order granting

1 #3

docket sheet

1 #2

certificate of mailing

1 #1

Notice of Appeal and Statement

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER/JUDGMENT. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/ by Teresa Jean Moore. (Attachments: #1 certificate of record, #2 docket sheet, #3 Appellant Designation part 1, #4 Appellant Designation part 2)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Wilson (Wilson, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-53510-SLJ. File received. Filed byTeresa Jean Moore. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement, #2 certificate of mailing, #3 docket sheet, #4 order granting, #5 Judgment)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.