This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 08:06:51 (UTC).

Moore et al v. Milacron Holdings Corp et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Moore filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Milacron Holdings Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-03386

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joshua Moore

Joyce Moore

Defendants

Milacron Holdings Corp

Milacron LLC

Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC

Milacron Marketing Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allison Paige Sullivan

Attorney at Bluestein Nichols Thompson and Delgado

Po Box 7965

Columbia, SC 29202

John Clarke Newton

Attorney at Bluestein Nichols Thompson and Delgado

Po Box 7965

Columbia, SC 29202

Defendant Attorneys

William Francis Marion, Jr

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd

Po Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Jonathan David Klett

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd

Po Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2019, Mediation Due by 6/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/1/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/15/2019, Discovery due by 11/29/2019, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/16/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/25/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#17

(#17) (Joint) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#16

(#16) (Joint) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Joint ADR/Mediation Statement by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed; to add text - ADR (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#15

(#15) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Milacron Marketing Company LLC.(Klett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joyce Moore, Joshua Moore. Service due by 4/10/2019 (Newton, John) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

11 #1

Acknowledgement of Removal

#11

(#11) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Removal)(Marion, William) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/2/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/5/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/5/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 2/5/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/17/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/17/2019, Discovery due by 6/17/2019, Motions due by 7/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/6/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/2/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Newton, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(Marion, William) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-42-03589. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8156529), filed by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC, Milacron LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2019, Mediation Due by 6/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/1/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/15/2019, Discovery due by 11/29/2019, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/16/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/25/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) (Joint) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (Joint) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Joint ADR/Mediation Statement by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed; to add text - ADR (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Milacron Marketing Company LLC, Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Klett, Jonathan) Modified on 1/24/2019: to add joint filers as listed (kmca). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Milacron Marketing Company LLC.(Klett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joyce Moore, Joshua Moore. Service due by 4/10/2019 (Newton, John) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Removal)(Marion, William) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/2/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/5/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/5/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 2/5/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/17/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/17/2019, Discovery due by 6/17/2019, Motions due by 7/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/6/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/2/19. (kmca) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua Moore, Joyce Moore.(Newton, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(Marion, William) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron LLC, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC.(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-42-03589. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8156529), filed by Milacron Holdings Corp, Milacron Plastics Technologies Group LLC, Milacron LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less