This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2019 at 08:13:03 (UTC).

Moon v. Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Moon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James E. Graham, R. Stan Baker and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00308

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

Referral Judges

James E. Graham

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neal B. Moon

Defendant

Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine M. Bolger

Attorney at McCorkle & Johnson, LLP

319 Tattnall Street

Savannah, GA 31401-8184

Mathew M. McCoy

Attorney at McCorkle & Johnson, LLP

319 Tattnall Street

Savannah, GA 31401-8184

Defendant Attorney

E. Righton J. Lewis

Attorney at Balch & Bingham, LLP

30 Ivan Allen Jr., Blvd., Nw, Suite 700

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company.(J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company answer due by 2/15/2019. #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/18/2019. (evk) Modified on 1/23/2019 (evk). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/31/2019. (J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company re #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/31/2019. (evk) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Johnson, E.) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits, Summons, Civil Coversheet and Rule 26 Instruction Order served on Denise Combs on January 2, 2019, filed by Neal B. Moon. (Bolger, Catherine) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (evs) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Submitted (Bolger, Catherine) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Rule 26 Instruction Order. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/20/2018. (evs) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit October 23, 2018 Correspondence

1 #1

Exhibit Flood Insurance Policy Packet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Neal B. Moon against Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Flood Insurance Policy Packet, #2 Exhibit October 23, 2018 Correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(evs) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company.(J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company answer due by 2/15/2019. #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/18/2019. (evk) Modified on 1/23/2019 (evk). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (wwp) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/31/2019. (J. Lewis, E.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company re #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/31/2019. (evk) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Johnson, E.) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits, Summons, Civil Coversheet and Rule 26 Instruction Order served on Denise Combs on January 2, 2019, filed by Neal B. Moon. (Bolger, Catherine) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (evs) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Submitted (Bolger, Catherine) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Rule 26 Instruction Order. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/20/2018. (evs) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Filing fee paid: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2505034. (evs) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Neal B. Moon against Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Flood Insurance Policy Packet, #2 Exhibit October 23, 2018 Correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(evs) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less