This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 17:10:54 (UTC).

Montilla et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Montilla filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Federal National Mortgage Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roselia Montufar

Neris Montilla

Ruben Velasquez

Michael Kyriakakis

Defendants

C.I.T. Bank, N.A.

75 North Fair Oaks Avenue

Pasedena, CA 91103

Federal Housing Finance Agency

Federal National Mortgage Association

Seterus, Inc.

Mr. Cooper

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd S. Dion

Attorney at Law Office of Todd S. Dion Esq.

628 Park Avenue, Suite 2C

Cranston, RI 02910

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel C. Bodurtha

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

56 Exchange Terrace, 5Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Ethan Z. Tieger

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

321 South Main Street, Suite 301

Providence, RI 02903

Michael A.F. Johnson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Alison Burton

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Alexandra G. Watson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

100 High Street, 20Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Allison J Schoenthal

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

875 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Chava Brandriss

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Admissions List

#16

(#16) MOTION for Noah A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312764 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Alison Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312476 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

14 #1

Attorney Admissions List

#14

(#14) MOTION for Michael A.F. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal Housing Finance Agency ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1311912 ) filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Chava Brandriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310447 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Allison Schoenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310090 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra G. Watson on behalf of Seterus, Inc. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Noah A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312764 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alison Burton. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/17/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Alison Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal National Mortgage Association ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1312476 ) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A.F. Johnson. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Michael A.F. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Federal Housing Finance Agency ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1311912 ) filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admissions List)(Tieger, Ethan) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chava Brandriss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Chava Brandriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310447 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison J Schoenthal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/10/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Allison Schoenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1310090 ) filed by Seterus, Inc.. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra G. Watson on behalf of Seterus, Inc. (Watson, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of C.I.T. Bank, N.A., Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association (Bodurtha, Samuel) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re #4 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Bodurtha, Samuel) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Mr. Cooper. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Request filed by Michael Kyriakakis, Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Summons Mr. Cooper)(Dion, Todd) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to C.I.T. Bank, N.A., Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Seterus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1289449 ), filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Dion, Todd) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1289449 ), filed by Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar, Ruben Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Dion, Todd) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less