This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2019 at 21:21:02 (UTC).

Montes et al v. MCT Transportation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Montes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCT Transportation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jorge L. Alonso and Maria Valdez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08326

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

Referral Judge

Maria Valdez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jorges Montes

Hilda Montes

Defendants

MCT Transportation, LLC

Daniel Bulthuis

Comcar Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Passen

Attorney at Passen & Powell

Suite 1750, One E Wacker Drive, Suite 1750

Chicago, IL 60601

Stephen W. Heil

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

James A. Foster

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

20 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60606-2903

Ryan Trevor Armour

Attorney at Cassiday Schade Llp

120 West State Street, Suite 401

Rockford, IL 61101

William Seth Howard

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed Notice(lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#40

(#40) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#39

(#39) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant's Motions for Entry of a Qualified Protective Order Pursuant to HIPAA #34 , #35 , #36 are granted. Motion hearings set for 2/27/19 are stricken. Initial status hearing previously set for 2/27/19 to stand. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

36 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#36

(#36) MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for protective order Hilda Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

35 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#35

(#35) MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for protective order Jorge Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

34 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

2 #8

Exhibit Bulthuis Driver's License

2 #7

Exhibit Comcar - Florida Division of Corporations Entity Detail

2 #6

Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

2 #5

Exhibit Declaration of Stevens

2 #3

Exhibit MCT - Delaware Division of Corporations Entity Detail

2 #2

Exhibit Correspondence

2 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (18L012833) filed by Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15298118. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Correspondence, #3 Exhibit MCT - Delaware Division of Corporations Entity Detail, #4 Exhibit Midwest Coast - Florida Divsion of Corporations Entity Detail, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Stevens, #6 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit Comcar - Florida Division of Corporations Entity Detail, #8 Exhibit Bulthuis Driver's License)(Foster, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#1

(#1) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC by James A. Foster (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed Notice(lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) QUALIFIED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/22/2019: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant's Motions for Entry of a Qualified Protective Order Pursuant to HIPAA #34 , #35 , #36 are granted. Motion hearings set for 2/27/19 are stricken. Initial status hearing previously set for 2/27/19 to stand. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Trevor Armour for presentment of motion for protective order #36 , motion for protective order #34 , motion for protective order #35 before Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/27/2019 at 10:15 AM. (Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for protective order Hilda Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for protective order Jorge Montes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for protective order Claudio Montes, a minor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Hilda Montes, Jorges Montes (Passen, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Initial status hearing is set before Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez on 2/27/19 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1041. Parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report, to Judge Valdezs Courtroom Deputy, Lisa Provine, Room 1036, four business days before the initial status hearing. The parties must follow the format for an Initial Status Report found on the Judges website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, or the parties can contact courtroom deputy, Lisa Provine, at (312)408-5135 for a copy. If the parties have recently prepared and filed an initial status report, the submission of the previously filed initial status report is sufficient. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Trevor Armour for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #8 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Defendants Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit)(Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 2/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website.Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC by Ryan Trevor Armour (Armour, Ryan) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (18L012833) filed by Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15298118. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Correspondence, #3 Exhibit MCT - Delaware Division of Corporations Entity Detail, #4 Exhibit Midwest Coast - Florida Divsion of Corporations Entity Detail, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Stevens, #6 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit Comcar - Florida Division of Corporations Entity Detail, #8 Exhibit Bulthuis Driver's License)(Foster, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Comcar Industries, Inc., Daniel Bulthuis, MCT Transportation, LLC by James A. Foster (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcar Industries Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MCT Transportation, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Foster