This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:17:45 (UTC).

Monster Energy Company v. Cycle Locators Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 Monster Energy Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Cycle Locators Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04551

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monster Energy Company

Defendants

Cycle Locators Inc.

Cycle Locators Inc. an Illinois corporation doing business as Monster Powersports

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven J Nataupsky

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Jason Alexander Champion

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Nicole Rossi Townes

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Lynda J Zadra-Symes

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Julianne Marie Hartzell

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun

233 South Wacker Drive, 6300 Sears Tower

Chicago, IL 60606-6357

Nicole R. Townes

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

14Th Floor, 2040 Main St.

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah Anne Hedley

Attorney at Vedder Price LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert Stephan Rigg

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

John Kelsey Burke

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#28

(#28) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#27

(#27) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

26 #1

*Restricted*

#26

(#26) RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-00050 (jjr) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#25

(#25) MINUTES OF Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. 15); and (2) TRANSFERRING this Case to the Northern District of Illinois Motion Hearing held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 06/29/2018)

15 #4

Proposed Order

15 #3

Declaration of Scott Cook in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal J

15 #2

Declaration of Deborah A. Hedley in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Per

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cycle Locators Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, identifying Monster Beverage Corporation, Parent; The Coca-Cola Company, Shareholder. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A1-A7

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cycle Locators Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-00050 (jjr) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTES OF Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. 15); and (2) TRANSFERRING this Case to the Northern District of Illinois Motion Hearing held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • (#24) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue [Doc. No.15] is hereby continued from May 14, 2018, to June 25, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue #15 filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Townes, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue #15 filed by Defendant Cycle Locators Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Scott Cook In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue, #2 Monster Powersports' Evidentiary Objections to Evidence Proffered by Plaintiff in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively Transfer Venue)(Hedley, Deborah) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) DECLARATION of Nicole R. Townes in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue #15 filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Townes, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DECLARATION of David C. Blondell in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Transfer Venue #15 filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Townes, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, upon Defendant Cycle Locators Inc. served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Cook, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cycle Locators Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, identifying Monster Beverage Corporation, Parent; The Coca-Cola Company, Shareholder. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21080809 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-A7) (Attorney Lynda J Zadra-Symes added to party Monster Energy Company(pty:pla))(Zadra-Symes, Lynda) [Transferred from California Central on 6/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less