This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:11:55 (UTC).

Moncada v. New Rue21, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/24/2018 Moncada filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against New Rue21, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-62557

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Moncada

Defendants

New Rue21, LLC

New Rue21, LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Rue21

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pelayo M. Duran

Attorney at Law Office of Pelayo Duran, PA

4640 Nw 7Th Street

Miami, FL 33126

Roderick Victor Hannah

Attorney at Roderick V. Hannah, Esq., P.A.

8751 West Broward Boulevard, Suite 303

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Ana Maria Barton

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Daniel Moncada (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hannah, Roderick) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Compliance with Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report by Daniel Moncada re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hannah, Roderick) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Rue21, LLC identifying Corporate Parent R21 Holdings, Inc. for New Rue21, LLC (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint by New Rue21, LLC. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party New Rue21, LLC (pty:dft). (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Daniel Moncada. New Rue21, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Duran, Pelayo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #7 Order (Verified Certificate Regarding Prior ADA Cases) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Amended Summons Issued as to New Rue21, LLC. (cbr) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Daniel Moncada. Attorney Roderick Victor Hannah added to party Daniel Moncada(pty:pla). (Hannah, Roderick) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Daniel Moncada re #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Moncada (Duran, Pelayo) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to New Rue21, LLC. (cbr) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Daniel Moncada re #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Moncada (Duran, Pelayo) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to New Rule21, LLC. (mee) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/25/2018) (mee). Document Security Modified on 10/25/2018 (mee). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against New Rue21, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11104191, filed by Daniel Moncada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Duran, Pelayo) Modified Text on 10/25/2018 (vmz). (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New rue21, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pelayo M. Duran

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roderick Victor Hannah