This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2018 at 07:23:42 (UTC).

Monat Global Corp. v. Miller

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Monat Global Corp filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Miller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24110

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monat Global Corp

Defendant

Toni Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda C. Yen

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson

2300 W. Sahara, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Joseph L. Hoolihan

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 East Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Julie F. Stewart

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 East Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

William C. Meyers

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd

55 E Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

George F. Ogilvie, III

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

2300 W Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Tara Clark Newberry

Attorney at Clark Newberry Law Firm

7854 W. Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Janet Robards Varnell

Attorney at Varnell and Warwick, P.A.

P. O. Box 1870

Lady Lake, FL 32158

 

Court Documents

54 #1

*Restricted*

#54

53 #1

Transmittal Letter

#53

52 #1

Minute Order

#52

#51

#50

43 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J - Facebook Page - Claim re Losing Babies, Period Every Two Weeks

1 #9

Exhibit I - Facebook Page - Infertility, Miscarriages, Wounds on Scalp Claims

1 #8

Exhibit H - Bloody Stool, Migraines, Bruising Claims

1 #7

Exhibit G - Scalp Pictures

1 #6

Exhibit F - Facebook Page - Menstruation Problems

1 #4

Exhibit D - Facebook Page - Infertility and harm to unborn babies

1 #3

Exhibit C - Facebook Page - Grandchild, toxicity, destroying lives

1 #2

Exhibit B - Facebook Page - PH Level is Unsafe

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Docket(#57) PAPERLESS Administrative Order Closing Case in light of inclusion of this matter in MDL Case No. 18-md-02841-GAYLES. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Docket(#56) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the District of Nevada. Case Number 2:18-00324 with documents 1-53. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:18-cv-24110-DPG on 10/5/2018. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:18-md-02841-DPG. (mc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Docket(#55) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (mc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Case transferred in from Nevada; Case Number 2:18-cv-00324. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Certified TRANSFER ORDER. MDL 2841. Signed by MDL Panel on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Conditional TRANSFER ORDER. MDL No. 2841. Signed by MDL Panel on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Interim STATUS REPORT by Defendant Toni Miller. (Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Toni Miller.(Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER Granting Defendant's #43 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) REPLY to Response to #41 Motion to Stay Case by Defendant Toni Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Toni Miller Declaration) (Varnell, Janet) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #9 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Third-Party Discovery. Plaintiff is to promptly file a return that demonstrates that the subpoena was served on Vicki Nittinger. Once Plaintiff files the subpoena return, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal this order and the underlying #9 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Amanda Yen - SLD) Modified on 6/13/2018 (JM). (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION for Expedited Third-Party Discovery; filed by Plaintiff Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena, #2 Declaration of Joseph L. Hoolihan) (Yen, Amanda) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monat Global Corp. re #1 Complaint,,,. Toni Miller served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Yen, Amanda) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency EX PARTE MOTION to Expedited Third-Party Discovery; filed by Plaintiff Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph L. Hoolihan, Esq.) (Yen, Amanda) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/26/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Toni Miller re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Monat Global Corp.. (Yen, Amanda) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Monat Global Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Yen, Amanda) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Toni Miller (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4978417) by Monat Global Corp.. Proof of service due by 5/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Facebook Page, #2 Exhibit B Facebook Page, #3 Exhibit C Facebook Page, #4 Exhibit D Facebook Page, #5 Exhibit E Facebook Page, #6 Exhibit F Facebook Page, #7 Exhibit G Scalp Pictures, #8 Exhibit H Bloody Stool, Migraines, Bruising Claims, #9 Exhibit I Facebook Page, #10 Exhibit J Facebook Page, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yen, Amanda) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monat Global Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Clark Newberry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet Robards Varnell