This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:26:25 (UTC).

MOLINA v. TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 MOLINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02016

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORBELINA MOLINA

Washington, DC 20010

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas E. Doyle

Attorney at DOYLE & ASSOCIATES, LLC

101 North Adams Street

Rockville, MD 20850

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan James Huber

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE, P.C.

1500 K. St., Nw, 8Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Daniel R. Lanier

Attorney at MILES & STOCKBRIDGE

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: The parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before November 16, 2018; the parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by November 19, 2018; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is December 4, 2018; Plaintiff shall make initial expert disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), on or before December 4, 2018; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before January 14, 2019; Defendant shall provide any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before February 5, 2019; discovery shall conclude on March 15, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for March 22, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/09/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Lanier on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION (Lanier, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Doyle on behalf of ORBELINA MOLINA (Doyle, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by TARGET CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for October 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018-cv-005384 V Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5661230 filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Doyle on behalf of ORBELINA MOLINA (Doyle, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), to be exchanged by 11/16/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 12/4/2018. Plaintiff's Initial Expert Disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), due by 12/4/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019. Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), due by 2/5/2019. Discovery shall conclude on 3/15/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: The parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before November 16, 2018; the parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by November 19, 2018; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is December 4, 2018; Plaintiff shall make initial expert disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), on or before December 4, 2018; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before January 14, 2019; Defendant shall provide any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before February 5, 2019; discovery shall conclude on March 15, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for March 22, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/09/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2018. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (gdf) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for October 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Lanier on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION (Lanier, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by TARGET CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018-cv-005384 V Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5661230 filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.