This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:53:46 (UTC).

Moffett, Walter et al v. Dittman, Michael et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Moffett, Walter filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dittman, Michael. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00656

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Defendants

Cynthia Neuhauser

Welzel

Ziggler

Julson

Gourlie

Buettner

Margan

Goldsmith

Allds

Gerry

Bortez

Krist DeYoung

Mary Leiser

Webber

Gohde

Rewey

Richard Raemisch

Alice Rogers

Schmidtknecht

Jane Doe #2

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#12

(#12) Letter from Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett regarding $81.55 initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Request, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

12 #1

Interview/Information Request

12 #2

Envelope

#11

(#11) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett assessed an initial partial filing fee of $81.55 due 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/14/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#10

(#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #2 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

8 #3

Exhibits X(y), F, F(2)-(3), N, P, Q, R, 1x, 2x, A, Ba, Bb, Da, Db, E, F, O(b)-(

8 #2

Exhibits 1-23 - Inmate Complaints, Complaint Numbers CCI-2017-22612, CCI-2017-1

8 #1

Exhibits A-C, 3 and D - Inmate Classification Report, Correspondence, Interview

#9

(#9) Supplement / Exhibits to Support #8 Declaration, filed by Walter J.D. Moffett (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-30 - Interview/Information Requests, Disbursement Requests, Notice of Inmate Placed in Temporary Lockup, Inmate Complaints, Correspondence, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

9 #1

Exhibits 1-30 - Interview/Information Requests, Disbursement Requests, Notice o

9 #2

Envelope

#8

(#8) Declaration of Walter J.D. Moffett re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, 3 and D - Inmate Classification Report, Correspondence, Interview/Information Requests, Offender Complaint, Adult Conduct Report, #2 Exhibits 1-23 - Inmate Complaints, Complaint Numbers CCI-2017-22612, CCI-2017-12697, CCI-2017-23918, CCI-2017-24158, Interview/Information Request, #3 Exhibits X(y), F, F(2)-(3), N, P, Q, R, 1x, 2x, A, Ba, Bb, Da, Db, E, F, O(b)-(e), M - Affidavit of Joeval Jones, Interview/Information Requests, Medical Restrictions/Special Needs, Correspondence, Adult Conduct Report, State court filings re John Doe Proceedings)(Exhibits docketed in order submitted by plaintiff.) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

7 #3

Envelope

7 #2

Affidavit of Mailing

7 #1

Cover Letter

#7

(#7) Motion / Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit of Mailing, #3 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Partial Filing fee received: $81.55, receipt number 34690032860. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter from Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett regarding $81.55 initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Request, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett assessed an initial partial filing fee of $81.55 due 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/14/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #2 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Supplement / Exhibits to Support #8 Declaration, filed by Walter J.D. Moffett (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-30 - Interview/Information Requests, Disbursement Requests, Notice of Inmate Placed in Temporary Lockup, Inmate Complaints, Correspondence, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration of Walter J.D. Moffett re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, 3 and D - Inmate Classification Report, Correspondence, Interview/Information Requests, Offender Complaint, Adult Conduct Report, #2 Exhibits 1-23 - Inmate Complaints, Complaint Numbers CCI-2017-22612, CCI-2017-12697, CCI-2017-23918, CCI-2017-24158, Interview/Information Request, #3 Exhibits X(y), F, F(2)-(3), N, P, Q, R, 1x, 2x, A, Ba, Bb, Da, Db, E, F, O(b)-(e), M - Affidavit of Joeval Jones, Interview/Information Requests, Medical Restrictions/Special Needs, Correspondence, Adult Conduct Report, State court filings re John Doe Proceedings)(Exhibits docketed in order submitted by plaintiff.) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion / Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit of Mailing, #3 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of Walter J.D. Moffett re: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Walter J.D. Moffett. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Walter J.D. Moffett. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Luke Weber, 6/12/18, #2 Exhibit B - Inmate complaint, 6/25/18, #3 Affidavit of mailing, #4 Envelope) (jef) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.