This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2018 at 07:56:22 (UTC).

Moats v. Minnix et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 Moats filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Minnix. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald R. Moats

Belington, WV 26250

Defendants

Mrs. Camfield

Betsy Jividen

Kathy Weekly

Debra Minnix

Jeff Sandy

Tammy Miller

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) LETTER from Donald R. Moats to United States District Court regarding #9 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Pro se petitioner providing the status of his fee request. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/31/2018. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/emailed to E. Howell and Trustee @ Officer Tygart Valley Regional Jail. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) VACATED per Order dated 10/31/2018 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/19/2018. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/emailed to E. Howell and Trustee @ Officer Tygart Valley Regional Jail. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). Modified on 10/31/2018 (cwm). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mrs. Camfield, Betsy Jividen, Tammy Miller, Debra Minnix, Jeff Sandy, Kathy Weekly, filed by Donald R. Moats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER from Donald R. Moats to United States District Court regarding #9 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Pro se petitioner providing the status of his fee request. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/31/2018. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/emailed to E. Howell and Trustee @ Officer Tygart Valley Regional Jail. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) VACATED per Order dated 10/31/2018 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/19/2018. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/emailed to E. Howell and Trustee @ Officer Tygart Valley Regional Jail. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). Modified on 10/31/2018 (cwm). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald R. Moats. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Donald R. Moats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald R. Moats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mrs. Camfield, Betsy Jividen, Tammy Miller, Debra Minnix, Jeff Sandy, Kathy Weekly, filed by Donald R. Moats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.