This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:35:10 (UTC).

Moates v. Woodruff, City of

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Moates filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Woodruff, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-02356

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrienne Moates

Defendant

Woodruff, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Shannon Leonard

Attorney at Kendrick and Leonard

Po Box 886

Columbia, SC 29202

Joshua Snow Kendrick

Attorney at Kendrick and Leonard

Po Box 6938

Greenville, SC 29606

Defendant Attorney

Amy M Snyder

Attorney at Clawson and Staubes LLC (Gville)

1000 E North Street, Suite 200

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrienne Moates. Woodruff, City of served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Refiled to correct event type.(abuc) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

5 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 11/19/2018 10:30 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/12/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Woodruff, City of (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7963046.), filed by Adrienne Moates. Service due by 11/26/2018(abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Woodruff, City of.(Snyder, Amy) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adrienne Moates.(abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Woodruff, City of. (abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Woodruff, City of.(Snyder, Amy) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/1/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/27/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/11/2019, Discovery due by 4/10/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2019, Motions due by 4/24/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/18/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 7/9/2019, Mediation Due by 5/8/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/12/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 11/19/2018 10:30 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/12/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/1/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/27/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/11/2019, Discovery due by 4/10/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2019, Motions due by 4/24/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/18/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 7/9/2019, Mediation Due by 5/8/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/12/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Woodruff, City of.(Snyder, Amy) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Woodruff, City of.(Snyder, Amy) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrienne Moates. Woodruff, City of served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Refiled to correct event type.(abuc) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Woodruff, City of. (abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adrienne Moates.(abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Woodruff, City of (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7963046.), filed by Adrienne Moates. Service due by 11/26/2018(abuc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.