This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:50:05 (UTC).

Moak et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Moak was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00633

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and In Re

Flechas & Associates, P.A.

Eduardo A. Flechas

The Flechas Law Firm

Appellants

Danny E. Cupit

Jackson, MS 39225

Bobby Moak

Defendants

RMC/CMG Portfolio Holding, LLC as assignee of Cambridge Management Group, LLC

Internal Revenue Service

MCF AF, LLC

Mississippi Department of Revenue

MCS Capital, LLC

WAG, LLC

Interested Parties

U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson

U.S. Trustee

Trustee

Stephen Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and In Re Attorney

R. Michael Bolen

Attorney at HOOD & BOLEN, PLLC

3770 Hwy. 80 West

Jackson, MS 39209

Appellant Attorneys

Robert W. Moak

Attorney at BOBBY MOAK, ATTORNEY

P. O. Box 242

Bogue Chitto, MS 39629

Danny E. Cupit

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANNY E. CUPIT, PC

P. O. Box 22929

Jackson, MS 39225

Defendant Attorneys

W. Thomas McCraney, III

Attorney at MCCRANEY MONTAGNET & QUIN, PLLC

602 Steed Road, Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Cynthia Lynn Eldridge-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Gulfport

1575 20Th Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

Stephanie M. Rippee

Attorney at WATKINS & EAGER, PLLC

P. O. Box 650, 400 East Capitol Street (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0650

Sylvie Derdeyn Robinson

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR

P.O. Box 23066

Jackson, MS 39225-3066

David N. Usry-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

Laura M. Glaze

Attorney at MACNEILL, MCKAY & GAY, PLLC

582 Lakeland East Drive, Suite B

Flowood, MS 39232

Luke Dove

Attorney at DOVE & CHILL

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 412

Ridgeland, MS 39157

James Eldred Renfroe

Attorney at RENFROE & PERILLOUX, PLLC

648 Lakeland East Dr., Suite A

Flowood, MS 39232

Trustee Attorney

Derek A. Henderson

Attorney at DEREK A. HENDERSON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

1765-A Lelia Drive, Suite 103

Jackson, MS 39216

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Appellant's BRIEF by Danny E. Cupit, Bobby Moak. (Cupit, Danny) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

2 #11

Cover Letter Transmittal Letter

2 #10

Amended Designation of the Record (Adv. Dkt. 200)

2 #9

Adversary Case 17-00006-ee Docket Sheet

2 #8

Part 3(b)

2 #7

Part 3(a) Designated Items: Adversary Case 17-00006-ee docket entries as

2 #6

Part 2(c)

2 #5

Part 2(b)

2 #4

Part 2(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03550-ee docket entries as

2 #3

Part 1(c)

2 #2

Part 1(b)

#2

(#2) ATTACHMENT re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Record on Appeal, Clerk's Certificate, (Attachments: #1 Part 1(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03549-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellant's amended desigation, #2 Part 1(b), #3 Part 1(c), #4 Part 2(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03550-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #5 Part 2(b), #6 Part 2(c), #7 Part 3(a) Designated Items: Adversary Case 17-00006-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #8 Part 3(b), #9 Adversary Case 17-00006-ee Docket Sheet, #10 Amended Designation of the Record (Adv. Dkt. 200), #11 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

1 #3

Cover Letter Transmittal Letter

1 #2

Supplement Docket Sheet

1 #1

Supplement Notice of Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-03549; Adversary Proceeding No. 17-00006-ee. File received. The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 9/12/2018 (KNS). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Appellant's BRIEF by Danny E. Cupit, Bobby Moak. (Cupit, Danny) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTACHMENT re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Record on Appeal, Clerk's Certificate, (Attachments: #1 Part 1(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03549-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellant's amended desigation, #2 Part 1(b), #3 Part 1(c), #4 Part 2(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03550-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #5 Part 2(b), #6 Part 2(c), #7 Part 3(a) Designated Items: Adversary Case 17-00006-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #8 Part 3(b), #9 Adversary Case 17-00006-ee Docket Sheet, #10 Amended Designation of the Record (Adv. Dkt. 200), #11 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-03549; Adversary Proceeding No. 17-00006-ee. File received. The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 9/12/2018 (KNS). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.