This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 13:44:54 (UTC).

M.J. Woods, Inc. v. Little Rapids Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 M J Woods, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Little Rapids Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn and Dennis Howell. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00356

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M.J. Woods, Inc.

Defendant

Little Rapids Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Wilkerson(Designation Retained)

David M. Carter(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Pinckney McGuire(Designation Retained)

Rebecca E. Crandall(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Joint MOTION to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order. The Court will extend the deadline for dispositive motions to 2/12/2018. The Court will, however, not extend the trial date, which remains June 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/15/2017. (khm)

#23

(#23) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/23/2017. (ejb)

#22

(#22) ORDER that Defendant submit its proposed order re protective order via cyberclerk so that Court can sign and enter the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/7/2017. (khm)

#19

(#19) ORDER denying the request for a conference with the Court and directing both sides to file briefs, not to exceed 5 pages, within 10 days of the entry of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/29/2017. (kby)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss with regard to Count Two of Pltf's 1 Complaint and this cause of action is dismissed; and granting 5 Motion to Dismiss with regard to Count Three of Pltf's 1 Complaint, and allegations contained in such request for relief are incorporated by reference into Pltf's prayer for relief or ad damnum clause without further amendment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 12/30/16. (ejb)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Joint MOTION to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order. The Court will extend the deadline for dispositive motions to 2/12/2018. The Court will, however, not extend the trial date, which remains June 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/15/2017. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/23/2017. (ejb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER that Defendant submit its proposed order re protective order via cyberclerk so that Court can sign and enter the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/7/2017. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying the request for a conference with the Court and directing both sides to file briefs, not to exceed 5 pages, within 10 days of the entry of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/29/2017. (kby)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss with regard to Count Two of Pltf's 1 Complaint and this cause of action is dismissed; and granting 5 Motion to Dismiss with regard to Count Three of Pltf's 1 Complaint, and allegations contained in such request for relief are incorporated by reference into Pltf's prayer for relief or ad damnum clause without further amendment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 12/30/16. (ejb)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Elizabeth Crandall