Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:43:24 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Lietaer

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lietaer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P. Gallagher and Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02071

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gordon P. Gallagher

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freida L. Mitchell

Aurora, CO 80010

Defendant

Jessica Lietaer

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Preliminary Record and Docket sheet

#17

(#17) LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Freida L. Mitchell to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket sheet)(angar, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#16

(#16) Misdirected NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order of Dismissal and #14 Judgment by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Transcript Order Form by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#14

(#14) JUDGMENT re: #13 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 9/20/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). If Ms. Mitchell files a notice of appeal she must also pay the full $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/20/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) Exhibit W by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#11

(#11) Conventionally Submitted Material : Exhibit M - A1C test to Amended Complaint #10 by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#10

(#10) AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Jessica Lietaer, filed by Freida L. Mitchell.(angar, ) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this minute order to file a response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/28/2018. (angar, ) copy of #6 Order resent to corrected address (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Order to Show Cause Addressed to Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 5 Case Assigned to Judge, #4 Case Transferred In - District Transfer Addressed to Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER to Show Cause. If Ms. Mitchell fails to show cause within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/15/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00749. File, transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Transferring Case to the District of Colorado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2018. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Freida L. Mitchell. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #2

envelope

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Freida L. Mitchell to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket sheet)(angar, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Misdirected NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order of Dismissal and #14 Judgment by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Transcript Order Form by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT re: #13 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 9/20/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). If Ms. Mitchell files a notice of appeal she must also pay the full $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/20/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Exhibit W by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Conventionally Submitted Material : Exhibit M - A1C test to Amended Complaint #10 by Plaintiff Freida L. Mitchell Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Jessica Lietaer, filed by Freida L. Mitchell.(angar, ) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this minute order to file a response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/28/2018. (angar, ) copy of #6 Order resent to corrected address (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Order to Show Cause Addressed to Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 5 Case Assigned to Judge, #4 Case Transferred In - District Transfer Addressed to Freida L. Mitchell. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER to Show Cause. If Ms. Mitchell fails to show cause within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/15/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00749. File, transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Transferring Case to the District of Colorado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2018. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Freida L. Mitchell. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jessica Lietaer, filed by Freida L. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less