This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2018 at 07:37:30 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Headley et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Headley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M. Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00769

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M. Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joann Mitchell

Defendants

Walter Posey

Elmore, AL 36025

Joseph Headley

Elmore, AL 36025

Jefferson Dunn

Grantt Culliver

Montgomery, AL 36117

Correctional Officer Burt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anil Ashok Mujumdar

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Denise Wiginton

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Paul Hartmann Rand

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Gregory Martin Zarzaur

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Howard Albritton

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Receipt

#2

#3

3 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann Mitchell. Grantt Culliver served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Mujumdar, Anil) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann Mitchell. Joseph Headley served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Mujumdar, Anil) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann Mitchell. Walter Posey served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Mujumdar, Anil) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plf's Complaint; Answer; Dunn has until 11/9/2018 to file his answer to Plf's #1 Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/11/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jefferson Dunn. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Howard Albritton on behalf of Jefferson Dunn. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #6 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Dunn. (Albritton, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (and Notice of Appearance) by Jefferson Dunn. (Albritton, Benjamin) Modified on 10/11/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joann Mitchell re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Mujumdar, Anil) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Correctional Officer Burt, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Joseph Headley, and Walter Posey; returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Joann Mitchell; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Joann Mitchell. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joann Mitchell. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Correctional Officer Burt, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Joseph Headley, Walter Posey (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050514.), filed by Joann Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Hartmann Rand(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anil A Mujumdar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Zarzaur