This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 08:15:27 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Coffee County, Georgia et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Coffee County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Mitchell

Defendants

A.J. Dovers

Coffee County, Georgia

Wesley Vickers

Johnny Wayne Jowers

Charles H. Dean

Jimmy Kitchens

Oscar Paulk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karla L. Walker

Attorney at Copeland, Haugabrook & Walker

P.O. Box 1933

Valdosta, GA 31603

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Wayne Jowers on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Jimmy Kitchens on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Oscar Paulk on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Charles Dean on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for A.J. Dover on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Coffee County on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing by Diane Mitchell re #1 Complaint. (Walker, Karla) Modified on 10/9/2018 (ca). (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Case Transfer re #5 Order, #1 Complaint. (ca) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER transferring this case to the Waycross division. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/19/2018. (ca) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/19/2018. (csr) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diane Mitchell. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2448547. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Coffee County, Georgia answer due 11/30/2018; Charles H. Dean answer due 11/30/2018; A.J. Dovers answer due 11/30/2018; Johnny Wayne Jowers answer due 11/30/2018; Jimmy Kitchens answer due 11/30/2018; Oscar Paulk answer due 11/30/2018; Wesley Vickers answer due 11/30/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Wayne Jowers on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Jimmy Kitchens on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Oscar Paulk on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Charles Dean on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for A.J. Dover on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers for Coffee County on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Wesley Vickers on 11/9/2018, filed by Diane Mitchell. (Walker, Karla) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Filing by Diane Mitchell re #1 Complaint. (Walker, Karla) Modified on 10/9/2018 (ca). (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Case Transfer re #5 Order, #1 Complaint. (ca) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER transferring this case to the Waycross division. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/19/2018. (ca) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/19/2018. (csr) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2448547. (csr) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *Entered in error*Summons Submitted as to all Defendants. (csr) Modified on 9/18/2018 (ca). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diane Mitchell. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2448547. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less