This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 11:51:31 (UTC).

MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC v. NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC, d/b/a MITCHELL 1

MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC

MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC doing business as MITCHELL 1

Defendant

NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLEN ROBERT BAUM

Attorney at BRINKS GILSON & LIONE

2801 Slater Rd., Ste. 120

Morrisville, NC 27560

GARY M. ROPSKI

Attorney at BRINKS GILSON & LIONE

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Dr., Nbc Tower, Ste. 3600

Chicago, IL 60611-5599

JAMES K. CLELAND

Attorney at BRINKS GILSON & LIONE

524 S. Main St., Ste. 200

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GARY M. ROPSKI on behalf of Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC (ROPSKI, GARY) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES K. CLELAND on behalf of Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC (CLELAND, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

#6

(#6) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC, d/b/a MITCHELL 1 (BAUM, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2369152.), filed by MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC, d/b/a MITCHELL 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BAUM, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GARY M. ROPSKI on behalf of Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC (ROPSKI, GARY) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES K. CLELAND on behalf of Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC (CLELAND, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC, d/b/a MITCHELL 1 (BAUM, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NOREGON SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2369152.), filed by MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC, d/b/a MITCHELL 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BAUM, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Kenneth Cleland