This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2018 at 05:32:54 (UTC).

Mitchell County v. Purdue Pharma LP

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 Mitchell County filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-45063

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell County, Texas

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

McKesson Corporation

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

1-50 Does

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig D. Cherry

Attorney at Haley & Olson

510 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern. Case number 1:17-cv-00197. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mitchell County. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8885841) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cherry, Craig) [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2804, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of Ohio. (jak) [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jmc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/27/2017) (jmc). [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

5 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern. Case number 1:17-cv-00197. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2804, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of Ohio. (jak) [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jmc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/27/2017) (jmc). [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jmc) [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mitchell County. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8885841) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cherry, Craig) [Transferred from txnd on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.