This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2019 at 07:01:49 (UTC).

Miralle et al v. The City of Oakland et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Miralle filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Oakland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-06823

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aiyahnna Johnson

Oakland, CA 94609

Anita Miralle

Oakland, CA 94609

Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I

Oakland, CA 94609

Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega

Oakland, CA 94609

Lucas D. Brown

Oakland, CA 94609

Tina Scott

Oakland, CA 94609

Defendants

Joe Devries

Libby Schaaf

The City of Oakland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Mark Siegel

Attorney at Siegel Yee & Brunner

475 14Th Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

EmilyRose Naomi Johns

Attorney at Siegel Yee & Brunner

475 14Th Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Joshua Piovia-Scott

Attorney at Hadsell Stormer & Renick LLP

4300 Horton Street, #15

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorneys

Jamilah A Jefferson

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

David Alejandro Pereda

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1301 Clay Street

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 26, 2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Jefferson, Jamilah) (Filed on 12/5/2018) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#46

(#46) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/26/2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Lucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Johns, EmilyRose) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#44

(#44) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (This order vacates the TRO) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#43

(#43) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Jefferson, Jamilah) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alejandro Pereda (Pereda, David) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#39

(#39) *** RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #41 *** REPLY (re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byLucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence ISO Reply)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2018)

38 #2

[Prop] Order re Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief

38 #1

Declaration Piovia-Scott Decl ISO Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief

#38

(#38) MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Brief filed by Lucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Piovia-Scott Decl ISO Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief, #2 [Prop] Order re Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lucas D. Brown. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aiyahnna Johnson. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tina Scott. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anita Miralle. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#3

(#39) *** RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #41 *** REPLY (re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byLucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence ISO Reply)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lucas D. Brown, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland. Filed byIrvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Lucas D. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 26, 2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Jefferson, Jamilah) (Filed on 12/5/2018) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/26/2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Lucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Johns, EmilyRose) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (This order vacates the TRO) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Jefferson, Jamilah) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 11/26/2018. Total Time in Court: 53 Minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorney: Anne Weills, Dan Siegel, Joshua Piovia-Scott and Emily Johns. Defendant Attorney: Jamilah Jefferson. Malia McPherson and Joe Devries. Plaintiffs motion to file an oversized brief (docket no. #38 ) is GRANTED by the Court. Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (docket no. #3 ) is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/26/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alejandro Pereda (Pereda, David) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) REPLY (re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #39 filed byLucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Brief ) filed by Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland. (Jefferson, Jamilah) (Filed on 11/25/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) *** RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #41 *** REPLY (re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byLucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence ISO Reply)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Brief filed by Lucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Piovia-Scott Decl ISO Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief, #2 [Prop] Order re Mtn for Leave to File Oversize Brief)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Lucas D. Brown, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lucas D. Brown. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aiyahnna Johnson. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tina Scott. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anita Miralle. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott. Responses due by 11/23/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lucas D. Brown, Anita Miralle, Irvin Josue Hernandez Ortega. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Joe Devries, Libby Schaaf, The City of Oakland. Filed byIrvin Josue Hernandez Ortega, Tina Scott, Jodii Le'Grand Everett, I, Aiyahnna Johnson, Anita Miralle, Lucas D. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamilah A Jefferson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alejandro Pereda