This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:48:53 (UTC).

MINOR v. OVERMYER et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 MINOR filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against OVERMYER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRED MINOR

Marienville, PA 16239

Defendants

J. W. SAWTELLE

DAVID KRAYNAK

D. F. OBERLANDER

MICHAEL D. OVERMYER

I GUSTAFSON

E. IRELAND

KERI MOORE

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Authorization or Withdrawal of Action

#8

(#8) It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Courts mark this action administratively closed until such time as Plaintiff returns a valid, unadulterated Authorization form bearing his signature. A copy of the Authorization form is attached to this order. Plaintiff may reopen this case by executing and returning a signed copy of the Authorization form to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is cautioned that any attempt to alter or modify the form will be deemed non-compliant and will result in this action remaining closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Remark: Courtesy Copy of #5 DECLARATION of Negotiable Primissory Note & Bill of Exchanbe to pay for Complaint re 2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Magistrate Judges' chambers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Negotiable Primissory Note & Bill of Exchanbe to pay for Complaint re #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #2

Envelope

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against I GUSTAFSON, E. IRELAND, DAVID KRAYNAK, KERI MOORE, D. F. OBERLANDER, MICHAEL D. OVERMYER, J. W. SAWTELLE, filed by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

2 #1

Authorization or Withdrawal of Action

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Courts mark this action administratively closed until such time as Plaintiff returns a valid, unadulterated Authorization form bearing his signature. A copy of the Authorization form is attached to this order. Plaintiff may reopen this case by executing and returning a signed copy of the Authorization form to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is cautioned that any attempt to alter or modify the form will be deemed non-compliant and will result in this action remaining closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Remark: Courtesy Copy of #5 DECLARATION of Negotiable Primissory Note & Bill of Exchanbe to pay for Complaint re 2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Magistrate Judges' chambers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Negotiable Primissory Note & Bill of Exchanbe to pay for Complaint re #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRED MINOR. (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against I GUSTAFSON, E. IRELAND, DAVID KRAYNAK, KERI MOORE, D. F. OBERLANDER, MICHAEL D. OVERMYER, J. W. SAWTELLE, filed by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Remark: USM 285 FORMS RECEIVED FOR ALL DEFENDANTS (jd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRED MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, #4 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less