This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Minerva Surgical, Inc. v. Hologic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 Minerva Surgical, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hologic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Sherry R. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Minerva Surgical, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC

Hologic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin J. Schladweiler

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher D. Mays

Dale R. Bish

Edward G. Poplawski

Erik J. Carlson

Neil N. Desai

Olivia M. Kim

Vera M. Elson

Defendant Attorneys

Karen L. Pascale

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Marc A. Cohn

Masanori (Marty) Koresawa

Matthew M. Wolf

Ryan J. Casamiquela

 

Court Documents

#80

#97

#96

#95

#94

#93

#92

#91

#90

#88

87 #1

*Restricted*

#87

#86

#85

84 #2

Appendix B

84 #1

Appendix A

#84

298 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re #96 Proposed Order. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Minerva Surgical, Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 4/3/2018 (lih). (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Masanori (Marty) Koresawa for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC,and for Hologic, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Masanori (Marty) Koresawa. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/20/2018. (lih) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Masanori (Marty) Koresawa - filed by Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan J. Casamiquela for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew M. Wolf for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, and for Hologic, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Marc A. Cohn for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew M. Wolf, Attorney Marc A. Cohn, and Attorney Ryan Casamiquela. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/12/2018. (lih) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew M. Wolf, Attorney Marc A. Cohn, and Attorney Ryan Casamiquela - filed by Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Returned Executed/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minerva Surgical, Inc. on Hologic, Inc.. (Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/19/2017) Modified on 4/20/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Returned Executed/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minerva Surgical, Inc. on Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. (Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/19/2017) Modified on 4/20/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form e-mailed to register). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Minerva Surgical, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Minerva Surgical, Inc. (Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11306681.). Filed byMinerva Surgical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elson, Vera) (Filed on 4/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Masanori (Marty) Koresawa