This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2022 at 06:32:25 (UTC).

Miner et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 Miner filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:17-CV-01295

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clara Miner

Daril Miner

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen D Bachman

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Quinn-Cooper

Andrew L Richardson

Michael F Smith

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#24

(#24) ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 45 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/14/2019. (mb) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order deadlines. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/20/2018. (mb) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#22

(#22) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

#19

(#19) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/21/2018. (mb) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#18

(#18) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Return of Service

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 45 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/14/2019. (mb) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketSet/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/10/2019. Motions due by 5/8/2019. Pretrial Report due by 6/14/2019. (mb) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order deadlines. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/20/2018. (mb) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/21/2018. (mb) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2018 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 1/29/2018. (mb) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen D Bachman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bachman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Subpoena to DPS)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company.(Quinn-Cooper, Mary) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ford Motor Company . (Quinn-Cooper, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2605177. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-2017-377 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less