This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2019 at 07:17:22 (UTC).

Min et al v. Longfin Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Min filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Longfin Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-10635

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank J. Fish

Loong Chee Min

Defendants

Venkat S. Meenavalli

Longfin Corp.

Suresh Tammineedi

Dorababu Penumarthi

Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc.

Amro Izzelden Altahawi

Vivek Kumar Ratakonda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lesley Frank Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniella Quitt

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

712 Fifth Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10019

Robert I. Harwood

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

712 Fifth Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit Defendants Service List

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniella Quitt dated 01/10/2019 re: Issues to be discussed at conference. Document filed by Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10635-DLC, 1:18-cv-02973-DLC(Quitt, Daniella) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter G. Siachos, Esq. dated January 10, 2019 Document filed by Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc..(Siachos, Peter) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc. served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service was accepted by Michael Molinaro, Managing Agent for Network 1 Financial Secs., Inc.. Document filed by Loong Chee Min; Frank J. Fish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10635-DLC, 1:18-cv-02973-DLC(Quitt, Daniella) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Longfin Corp. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Officer of the State of New York. Document filed by Loong Chee Min; Frank J. Fish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10635-DLC, 1:18-cv-02973-DLC(Quitt, Daniella) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS SIMILAR. Create association to 1:18-cv-02973-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amro Izzelden Altahawi, Longfin Corp., Venkat S. Meenavalli, Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc., Dorababu Penumarthi, Vivek Kumar Ratakonda, Suresh Tammineedi. (pne) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LONGFIN CORP., VENKAT S. MEENAVALLI, VIVEK KUMAR RATAKONDA, AMRO IZZELDEN ALTAHAWI, SURESH TAMMINEEDI, DORABABU PENUMARTHI, NETWORK 1 FINANCIAL SECURITIES, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min. (Quitt, Daniella) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert I. Harwood to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption Error; The caption must directly correspond to the pleading. If the entire caption does not fit list the leading defendant followed by et al. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly similar to 1:18-cv-02973. (dnh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert I. Harwood. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Longfin Corp., Venkat S. Meenavalli, Vivek Kumar Ratakonda, Amro Izzelden Altahawi, Suresh Tammineedi, Dorababu Penumarthi, Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants Service List)(Harwood, Robert) Modified on 11/15/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lesley Frank Portnoy on behalf of Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniella Quitt on behalf of Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min. (Quitt, Daniella) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Frank J. Fish, Loong Chee Min.(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amro Izzelden Altahawi, Longfin Corp., Venkat S. Meenavalli, Network 1 Financial Securities, Inc., Dorababu Penumarthi, Vivek Kumar Ratakonda, Suresh Tammineedi. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15913785)Document filed by Loong Chee Min, Frank J. Fish.(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETWORK 1 FINANCIAL SECURITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LongFin Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniella Quitt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lesley F. Portnoy