This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 08:07:28 (UTC).

Milner v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Milner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah A. L. Merriam, Janet C. Hall and Stefan R. Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01276

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

Presiding Judges

Janet C. Hall

Stefan R. Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ceresse Milner

Enfield, CT 06082

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Rothstein

Attorney at Social Security Administration - NY

26 Federal Plaza

New York, NY 10278

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Consent Form

#3

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

4 #1

Consent Form

#13

(#13) REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/2018.(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#10

RESTRICTED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Second CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security re #12 Notice of Appearance (Rothstein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/2018.(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • (#14) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to District Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rothstein on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rothstein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceresse Milner. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. Service made by Clerk via email. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Ceresse Milner* *40 Burns Ave.* *Enfield, CT 06082*. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. See id. at 2. Plaintiff states that she is paid $183.16 bi-weekly. See id. at 3. Plaintiff states that she has $509 in monthly obligations. See Id. at 4-5. These allegations are sufficient, at this stage, to establish that plaintiff "is unable to pay" the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/3/18. (Tepe, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice to Self-represented Parties Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice re: Statistical Information Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Appearance Self Represented Party by Ceresse Milner (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ceresse Milner. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ceresse Milner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.