This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:03:13 (UTC).

Miller v. POM Recoveries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Miller filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against POM Recoveries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and William F. Kuntz, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04822

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katie Miller

Defendant

POM Recoveries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ibrahim Abohamra

Attorney at Sirotkin Varacalli & Hamra, LLP

110 East 59Th St. Ste. 3200

New York, NY 10022

Jaclene Rosemary Troisi

Attorney at Varacalli & Hamra, LLP

32 Broadway, Suite 1818

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorney

Robert L. Arleo

Attorney at Robert L. Arleo, Esq.

380 Lexington Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10168

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by POM Recoveries, Inc.. (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Katie Miller (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Summons

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Katie Miller (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by POM Recoveries, Inc. (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Arleo on behalf of POM Recoveries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to POM Recoveries, Inc. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclene Rosemary Troisi on behalf of Katie Miller (aty to be noticed) (Troisi, Jaclene) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against POM Recoveries, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10681115, filed by Katie Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons) (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by POM Recoveries, Inc.. (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by POM Recoveries, Inc. (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Arleo on behalf of POM Recoveries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Arleo, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclene Rosemary Troisi on behalf of Katie Miller (aty to be noticed) (Troisi, Jaclene) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to POM Recoveries, Inc. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Katie Miller (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Defendant listed on the Proposed summons is not listed on the Complaint. In order to issue summons, defendant must be listed on the Complaint. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Katie Miller (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE : The Proposed summons is rejected; Counsel is advised to submit a ***COMPLETED*** proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against POM Recoveries, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10681115, filed by Katie Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons) (Abohamra, Ibrahim) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.