This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 06:17:13 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01108

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicole Miller

Charles Miller

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amar B. Raval

Attorney at Berg Plummer Johnson & Raval, LLP

3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77098

James C. Plummer

Attorney at Berg Plummer Johnson & Raval

3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald Dean Wamsted

Attorney at Thompson Coe, LLP

701 Brazos, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

John W. Chambless, II

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons

701 Brazos, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Bradley Wade Petersen

Attorney at Slattery Petersen PLLC

340 East Palm Lane, Suite 250

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#10

(#10) Original ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint (First) by Ford Motor Company.(Chambless, John) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Charles Miller.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Amar B. Raval (Raval, Amar) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wade Petersen on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Bradley Wade Petersen added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#5

#4

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wamsted, Ronald) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/13/2018. (td) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The parties' deadline to submit a joint proposed scheduling order is extended to August 13, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Issuance of Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Charles Miller, Nicole Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Original ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint (First) by Ford Motor Company.(Chambless, John) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Charles Miller.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Amar B. Raval (Raval, Amar) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty James C. Plummer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James C. Plummer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10231016) by on behalf of Charles Miller, Nicole Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Plummer, James) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wade Petersen on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Bradley Wade Petersen added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to James C. Plummer re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Miller, Nicole Miller. (afd) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Correct Exhibit B by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Chambless, John) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Ford Motor Company. (Chambless, John) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-10203225), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Appendix, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5)(Chambless, John) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less