This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 08:00:23 (UTC).

Millane v. Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Millane filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson Hornik LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David E Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01175

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David E Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James A Millane

Defendant

Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marwan R Daher

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd

2500 S Highland Ave - Ste 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Omar T Sulaiman

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd

2500 S Highland Ave - Ste 200

Lombard, IL 60148

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP by James A Millane. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2887872) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Sulaiman, Omar) Modified on 7/31/2018 (amb).

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Omar T Sulaiman on behalf of James A Millane. Attorney(s) appearing: Omar T. Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #2

Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit C

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit D

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marwan R Daher on behalf of James A Millane. Attorney(s) appearing: Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James A Millane. Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP served on 8/23/2018. (Sulaiman, Omar)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

#6

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Terminated pursuant to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (amb) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Settlement by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James A Millane. Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP served on 8/23/2018. (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James A Millane. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by James A Millane. (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 07/31/2018. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marwan R Daher on behalf of James A Millane. Attorney(s) appearing: Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Omar T Sulaiman on behalf of James A Millane. Attorney(s) appearing: Omar T. Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP by James A Millane. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2887872) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Sulaiman, Omar) Modified on 7/31/2018 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.