This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:16:44 (UTC).

Milkovich et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Milkovich filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01658

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lisa Milkovich

Dang Nguyen

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth C. Weil

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH C. WEIL

1001 Fourth Ave, Suite 3801

Seattle, WA 98154-1101

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2019, (Cerling, Dylan) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to on 11/16/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Weil, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America (GT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Income Tax Refund against defendant(s) Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen United States of America (Receipt # 0981-5545138) Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Lisa Milkovich(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Dang Nguyen (pty:pla), filed by Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Weil, Kenneth) Modified on 11/20/2018 to correctly identify defendant (KB). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER granting #6 consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States answer, or other response to the Complaint, shall bedue on March 16, 2019. signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2019, (Cerling, Dylan) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER: At counsel for plaintiff's request, the initial scheduling deadlines are continued as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/15/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to on 11/16/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Weil, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America (GT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Income Tax Refund against defendant(s) Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen United States of America (Receipt # 0981-5545138) Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Lisa Milkovich(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Dang Nguyen (pty:pla), filed by Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Weil, Kenneth) Modified on 11/20/2018 to correctly identify defendant (KB). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.