This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2019 at 07:39:32 (UTC).

Miles #237011 v. Helinski et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Miles 237011 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Helinski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Timothy P. Greeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Timothy P. Greeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kushawn S. Miles #237011

Kincheloe, MI 49784

Defendants

J. Corrigan

Jenna Helinski

Jennifer Hill

Unknown LaLonde

Unknown Henderson

Crystal Bigger

Unknown Blemke

Connie Horton

Unknown Gierki

Unknown Batho

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Allan J. Soros

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#14

(#14) CORRECTED ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; replies due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #9 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, lep) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#12

(#12) (DISREGARD) ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; reply due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified on 2/7/2019 - see order #14 (cam). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Crystal Bigger re Statement to Exclude Case from Early Mediation #9 , Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Soros, Allan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#9

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Crystal Bigger re Statement to Exclude Case from Early Mediation #9 , Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Soros, Allan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

8 #2

Attachment 2

8 #1

Attachment 1

#8

(#11) (DISREGARD) ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; replies due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified text on 2/7/2019 - order did not attach, please see #12 (slk). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#6

Copy of Order Dismissing Party, #6 , Opinion (Screening) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles (slk) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#5

Copy of Order Dismissing Party, #6 , Opinion (Screening) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles (slk) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

3 #2

Financial Document 2

3 #1

Financial Document 1

#3

(#3) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Kushawn S. Miles #237011; (Attachments: #1 Financial Document 1, #2 Financial Document 2) (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Kushawn S. Miles #237011; (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

1 #1

Appendix A through Appendix H

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kushawn S. Miles #237011 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A through Appendix H) (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendant Crystal Bigger (slk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Lifting Stay and Regarding Service - Prisoner #15 , Order Regarding Response to Motion #14 , Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles (slk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Order Regarding Response to Motion #12 was filed in error and should be disregarded - the ECF number for the motion was incorrect on the order (cam) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORRECTED ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; replies due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #9 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, lep) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Regarding Response to Motion #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles (slk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (DISREGARD) ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; reply due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified on 2/7/2019 - see order #14 (cam). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) (DISREGARD) ORDER regarding response to Motion for Contempt #8 responses due by 2/20/2019; replies due by 2/27/2019; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified text on 2/7/2019 - order did not attach, please see #12 (slk). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Crystal Bigger re Statement to Exclude Case from Early Mediation #9 , Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Soros, Allan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for contempt (accepted for filing on 2/5/2019) by plaintiff Kushawn S. Miles #237011; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - proposed order, #2 Attachment 2) (slk) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (slk). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles #237011 (ns) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by February 8, 2019; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, lep) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Dismissing Party, #6 , Opinion (Screening) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kushawn S. Miles (slk) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for partial dismissal dismissing J. Corrigan (Assistant Deputy Warden), Unknown Gierki (Captain), Jenna Helinski (Employment Readiness Counselor), Unknown Henderson (Sergeant), Jennifer Hill (School Secretary), Connie Horton (Warden), Unknown LaLonde (Deputy Warden), Unknown Batho (Residential Unit Manager) and Unknown Blemke (Sergeant); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) Modified text on 1/10/2019 (slk). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Kushawn S. Miles #237011; (Attachments: #1 Financial Document 1, #2 Financial Document 2) (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Kushawn S. Miles #237011; (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kushawn S. Miles #237011 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A through Appendix H) (slk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less