This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2018 at 05:59:30 (UTC).

Micor Industries, Inc. v. Mazak Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 Micor Industries, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mazak Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Micor Industries, Inc.

Defendant

Mazak Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip D Mitchell, II

Attorney at Harris Caddell & Shanks PC

P.O. Box 2688

Decatur, AL 35602-2688

Jay Aughtman

Attorney at The Aughtman Law Firm

1772 Platt Place

Montgomery, AL 36117

Defendant Attorneys

T Kelly May

Attorney at Huie, Fernambucq & Stewart LLP

2801 Highway 280 South, Suite 200 Three Protective Center

Birmingham, AL 35223-2484

Hugh Cannon Lawley

Attorney at Huie, Fernambucq & Stewart LLP

2801 Highway 280 South, Suite 200 Three Protective Center

Birmingham, AL 35223-2484

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Attorney Data Sheet

#29

(#29) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY T. Kelly May by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

28 #1

Attorney Data Sheet

#28

(#28) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Hugh Cannon Lawley by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Main Document 28 replaced on 2/27/2018) (LST). (Entered: 02/27/2018)

27 #1

Attorney Data Sheet

#27

(#27) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Phillip D. Mitchell, II by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

26 #1

Attorney Data Sheet

#26

(#26) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jay Aughtman by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#25

(#25) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 02/27/2018)

6 #48

Exhibit

6 #11

Exhibit

#5

(#22) ORDER For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum of Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer #5 and #6 is GRANTED and this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (doc. 8) and Motion to Strike (doc. 15) are DENIED. ORDER transferring case to the EASTERN District of Kentucky; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be emailed to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/9/2018. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 02/09/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred Judge Coogler until further notice. Please use case number 5:17-CV-1408-UJH-LSC on all subsequent pleadings (AHI) Modified on 8/22/2017 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Mazak Corporation.(May, T) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Mazak Corporation. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit A part 2

1 #1

Exhibit A part 1

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2913746 (B4601082541). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mazak Corporation from the Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-cv-2017-900315. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2)(SPT ) Modified on 8/21/2017 (AHI). Modified on 8/22/2017 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY T. Kelly May by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Hugh Cannon Lawley by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Main Document 28 replaced on 2/27/2018) (LST). (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Phillip D. Mitchell, II by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jay Aughtman by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 5:17-cv-01408. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum of Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer #5 and #6 is GRANTED and this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (doc. 8) and Motion to Strike (doc. 15) are DENIED. ORDER transferring case to the EASTERN District of Kentucky; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be emailed to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/9/2018. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/9/2018. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Micor Industries, Inc.. (Aughtman, Jay) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer by Micor Industries, Inc.. (Aughtman, Jay) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand by Micor Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Aughtman, Jay) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that the Plaintiff has 10 days from the date of this Order to respond to the #5 MOTION to Dismiss and the Amended #6 MOTION to Dismiss; Defendant will thereafter have 7 days to file a reply as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 08/30/17. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer by Mazak Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit)(May, T) Modified on 8/29/2017 (SPT). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer by Mazak Corporation. (May, T) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred Judge Coogler until further notice. Please use case number 5:17-CV-1408-UJH-LSC on all subsequent pleadings (AHI) Modified on 8/22/2017 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2913746 (B4601082541). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mazak Corporation from the Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-cv-2017-900315. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2)(SPT ) Modified on 8/21/2017 (AHI). Modified on 8/22/2017 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Mazak Corporation.(May, T) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Mazak Corporation. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mazak Corporation from the Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-cv-2017-900315 with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2)(SPT ) Modified on 8/21/2017 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 2/27/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less