This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:08:38 (UTC).

Mickens v. Edmond, et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Mickens filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Edmond. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02643

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty Mickens

Defendants

Kingdom Life Transport, Inc

James Edmond

Kingdom Life Transport, Inc doing business as Kingdom Freight

Not Classified By Court

Jimmy Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Marshall

Attorney at REAVES LAW FIRM, PLLC

4466 Elvis Presley Blvd., Ste 310

Memphis, TN 38120

Defendant Attorney

Carl Wyatt

Attorney at GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

26 N. Second Street

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following deadlines/schedules have been established: joining parties/amended pleadings ddl 12/31/18; motions to dismiss ddl 01/30/19; expert disclosures due 05/17/19 for pltf, 06/16/19 for defts; expert witness depositions ddl 07/16/19; supplementation ddl 07/16/19; written discovery ddl 07/16/19; depositions ddl 06/30/19; all discovery ddl 07/16/19; mediation ddl 07/31/19; dispositive motions ddl 08/15/19; Jury Trial set Monday, 12/02/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 11/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 11/01/2018. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/02/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. (zsf) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James Edmond.(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#7

(#7) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 11/01/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#3

(#3) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of James Edmond (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit Notice of Notice Filing Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Discovery to Edmond

1 #4

Exhibit Discovery to Kingdom Life

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Returned Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Edmond from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003523-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2883185), filed by James Edmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Returned Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Discovery to Kingdom Life, #5 Exhibit Discovery to Edmond, #6 Exhibit Notice of Notice Filing Removal)(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following deadlines/schedules have been established: joining parties/amended pleadings ddl 12/31/18; motions to dismiss ddl 01/30/19; expert disclosures due 05/17/19 for pltf, 06/16/19 for defts; expert witness depositions ddl 07/16/19; supplementation ddl 07/16/19; written discovery ddl 07/16/19; depositions ddl 06/30/19; all discovery ddl 07/16/19; mediation ddl 07/31/19; dispositive motions ddl 08/15/19; Jury Trial set Monday, 12/02/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 11/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 11/01/2018. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/02/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. (zsf) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • (#9) MINUTES: Scheduling Conference held on 11/01/2018 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Steven Marshall appeared on behalf of the pltf; Atty Carl Wyatt appeared on behalf of the defendants; proposed scheduling order was adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: joining parties/amended pleadings ddl 12/31/18; motions to dismiss ddl 01/30/19; expert disclosures due 05/17/19 for pltf, 06/16/19 for defts; expert witness depositions ddl 07/16/19; supplementation ddl 07/16/19; written discovery ddl 07/16/19; depositions ddl 06/30/19; all discovery ddl 07/16/19; mediation ddl 07/31/19; dispositive motions ddl 08/15/19; Jury Trial set Monday, 12/02/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 11/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 11/15/2019. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (zsf) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James Edmond.(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 11/01/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of James Edmond (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Edmond from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003523-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2883185), filed by James Edmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Returned Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Discovery to Kingdom Life, #5 Exhibit Discovery to Edmond, #6 Exhibit Notice of Notice Filing Removal)(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less