This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2018 at 07:29:37 (UTC).

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund et al v. JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and David M. Lawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12696

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund

CARPENTERS WORKING DUES FUND

Michigan Statewide Carpenters and Millwrights Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Carpenters Industry Advancement Fund

Carpenters Guaranty Fund

Carpenters Special Assessment Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund

Carpenters Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America

Carpenters Labor Management Productivity and Training Fund

Defendants

Brad Klauss

JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan M. Beckerman

Attorney at Novara, Tesija,

2000 Town Center, Suite 2370

Southfield, MI 48075-1314

Defendant Attorney

Clifford L. Hammond

Attorney at Foster Swift Collins & Smith, PC

28411 Northwestern Highway, Suite 500

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document due date. (SPin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER STRIKING CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC, Brad Klauss. (Hammond, Clifford) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#9

(#9) Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #5 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed, #6 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Brad Klauss* (DWor) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit 2-2 Trust Agreement-Annuity Fund

1 #3

Exhibit 2-1 Trust Agreement-Pension Fund

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Trust Agreement-Employee Benefits Fund

1 #1

Exhibit 1-CBA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6881724 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-CBA, #2 Exhibit 2-Trust Agreement-Employee Benefits Fund, #3 Exhibit 2-1 Trust Agreement-Pension Fund, #4 Exhibit 2-2 Trust Agreement-Annuity Fund) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document due date. (SPin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER STRIKING CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC, Brad Klauss. (Hammond, Clifford) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #5 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed, #6 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brad Klauss served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) Modified on 10/2/2018 (SSch). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) Modified on 10/2/2018 (SSch). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Brad Klauss* (DWor) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *JACOB BUILDING GROUP, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6881724 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-CBA, #2 Exhibit 2-Trust Agreement-Employee Benefits Fund, #3 Exhibit 2-1 Trust Agreement-Pension Fund, #4 Exhibit 2-2 Trust Agreement-Annuity Fund) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Carpenters Labor Management Productivity and Training Fund is a litigant