This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2018 at 07:24:25 (UTC).

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund et al v. Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Detroit A J Construction, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12486

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund

CARPENTERS WORKING DUES FUND

Michigan Statewide Carpenters and Millwrights Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Carpenters Industry Advancement Fund

Carpenters Guaranty Fund

Carpenters Special Assessment Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund

Carpenters Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity

ICHIGAN REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA

Carpenters Labor Management Productivity and Training Fund

Defendants

John McCatty

Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan M. Beckerman

Attorney at Novara, Tesija,

2000 Town Center, Suite 2370

Southfield, MI 48075-1314

Defendant Attorney

Ian S. Bolton

Attorney at Ian Bolton Law, PLLC

24361 Greenfield Rd, Suite 201

Southfield, MI 48075

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATED ORDER to Extend the Time for Defendants to File An Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint, ( Response due by 10/17/2018). Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ian S. Bolton appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Bolton, Ian) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John McCatty served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C. served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *John McCatty* (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C.* (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2-2

1 #3

Exhibit 2-1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6855150 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATED ORDER to Extend the Time for Defendants to File An Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint, ( Response due by 10/17/2018). Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ian S. Bolton appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Bolton, Ian) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John McCatty served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C. served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *John McCatty* (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit A & J Construction, L.L.C.* (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6855150 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund is a litigant