This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:43:41 (UTC).

Michaels v. Grant County Animal Shelter et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Michaels filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Grant County Animal Shelter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Michaels

Defendants

Stephen Wood

Kathleen Ritzi

Grant County Animal Shelter

Grant County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony J. Bucher

Attorney at B. Dahlenburg Bonar

3611 Decoursey Avenue

Covington, KY 41015

Barbara D. Bonar

Attorney at Law Offices of B. Dahlenburg Bonar, P.S.C.

3611 Decoursey Avenue

Covington, KY 41015

Defendant Attorneys

Lyndol Scott Miller

Attorney at Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC

333 W.Vine Street, Suite 1500

Lexington, KY 40507

Joshua Michael Salsburey

Attorney at Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC

333 W.Vine Street, Suite 1500

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood filed by Patricia Michaels. (Bucher, Anthony) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#7

(#7) ORDER: that the Motion for Extension of Time #6 is granted. Defendants shall have up to and including twenty-one (21) days after the Court has entered a ruling on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss #5 within which to answer or otherwise respond to any remaining claims in Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 07/31/2018. (KRB)cc: COR Modified text on 8/2/2018 (KRB). (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter. (ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

5 #2

Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Record

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-Counts to be Dismissed Against Each Defendant, #2 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

5 #1

Appendix 1-Counts to be Dismissed Against Each Defendant

#9

(#9) REPLY to #8 RESPONSE TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood. (Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grant County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00194. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4120306), filed by Grant County Animal Shelter, Grant County, Stephen Wood individually, Stephen Wood officially, Kathleen Ritziindividually, Kathleen Ritzi officially. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/16/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPLY to #8 RESPONSE TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood. (Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood filed by Patricia Michaels. (Bucher, Anthony) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: that the Motion for Extension of Time #6 is granted. Defendants shall have up to and including twenty-one (21) days after the Court has entered a ruling on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss #5 within which to answer or otherwise respond to any remaining claims in Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 07/31/2018. (KRB)cc: COR Modified text on 8/2/2018 (KRB). (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-Counts to be Dismissed Against Each Defendant, #2 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter. (ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grant County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00194. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4120306), filed by Grant County Animal Shelter, Grant County, Stephen Wood individually, Stephen Wood officially, Kathleen Ritziindividually, Kathleen Ritzi officially. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.