This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 01:34:41 (UTC).

Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. et al v. Syngenta AG et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 Michael's Grain Farm, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David R. Herndon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David R. Herndon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael's Grain Farm, Inc

Michael's Grain Farm, Inc.

Fred Timothy Donaldson, Jr

Kevin Milhouse

Daffaine Shannon

Arthur L. Shannon

Blanche P. Jones

Willie D. Reese

All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320

Blankenship Farms, Inc.

Connie Cole

Kimberly A. Cline

Kyle D. Cline

Michael B. Cline

Michael L. Cline

Terry Cline

Tyler J. Cline

Allen J. Cline

Charles Holst

Defendant

Syngenta AG

1,587 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Quillin

Attorney at O'Leary Shelton et al

1034 South Brentwood Boulevard, Penthouse 1-A, 23Rd Floor

St. Louis, MO 63117

Mark Ekonen

Attorney at Heninger, Garrison, et al.

2224 First Avenue North, P. O. Box 11310

Birmingham, AL 35202

W. Wylie Blair

Attorney at OnderLaw, LLC

110 East Lockwood, 2Nd Floor

St. Louis, MO 63119

Other Attorneys

Jordan M. Heinz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER appointing plaintiffs' settlement negotiation committee. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/9/2017. (ceh) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed until thirty days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action to an MDL proceeding and completes any such transfer action. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/10/2017. (ceh) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#25

(#25) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to District of Kansas and MDL #2591. (kls3) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

#23

(#23) Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order.(cds) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

20 #1

Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Heinz on behalf of Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Corporation served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/28/2017)

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#8

(#10) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Summonses Requested. Submitted summonses are fillable documents. Counsel is reminded that fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF's prior to docketing in CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/22/2017)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE: Case transferred confirmation received from District of Kansas, 2:17-cv-02460. (jsm2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Docket(#26) Case electronically transferred to USDC-Kansas. (kls3) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER appointing plaintiffs' settlement negotiation committee. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/9/2017. (ceh) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to District of Kansas and MDL #2591. (kls3) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order.(cds) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed until thirty days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action to an MDL proceeding and completes any such transfer action. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/10/2017. (ceh) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Heinz on behalf of Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Corporation served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Summonses Requested. Submitted summonses are fillable documents. Counsel is reminded that fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF's prior to docketing in CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Mark Ekonen. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Requested. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Requested. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Requested. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested. (Blair, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Ekonen $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3276567 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ekonen, Mark) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David R. Herndon assigned. All future documents must bear case number 17-320-DRH. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jlrr) (Entered: 03/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Blair on behalf of All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320 (Blair, William) (Entered: 03/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3204273.), filed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blair, William) (Entered: 03/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan M. Heinz