This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:34:28 (UTC).

Mezran v. Taylor, District Director, et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Mezran filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Taylor, District Director. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01535

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karim Mezran

Defendants

Sarah Taylor, District Director,

Christopher Wray

Matthew G. Whitaker

Kirstjen M. Nielsen

L. Francis Cissna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Denyse Sabagh

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

505 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Sarah Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Hon. Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for L. Francis Cissna (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Matthew Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Exhibit 1

6 #1

Exhibit 1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Sarah Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Hon. Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for L. Francis Cissna (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Matthew Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #10 NOTICE Proof of Service Christopher Wray, #7 NOTICE Proof of Service G. Zachary Terwilliger, #8 NOTICE Proof of Service L. Francis Cissna, #9 NOTICE Proof of Service Honorable Kirstijen M. Nielsen, #6 NOTICE Proof of Service Michael Whitaker. The filer has been notified to provide signatures on DE #6 , #7 , #8 and DE #9 , #10 should be filed as non-fillable. (acha, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Honorable Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for L. Francis Cissna (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Michael Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ALIAS Summons Issued as to Sarah Taylor, District Director. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons for Sarah Taylor by Karim Mezran. (Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Karim Mezran Return of Unexecuted Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Return to Sender Notice)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Sarah Taylor, District Director,, Matthew G. Whitaker, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint For Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6403336.), filed by Karim Mezran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 11, #2 Exhibit 12 thru 23, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.