This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 18:33:03 (UTC).

Meridian Textiles, Inc. v. One Step Up, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 Meridian Textiles, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against One Step Up, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-09234

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meridian Textiles, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

One Step Up, Ltd.

Ross Stores, Inc.

Ross Stores, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as DDs Discounts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Howard S Han

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-09234 JAK(PJWx). (rn) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants One Step Up, Ltd., Ross Stores, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21023671 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Meridian Textiles Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV17-09234 JAK (PJWx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials CBM on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #8 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-09234 JAK(PJWx). (rn) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants One Step Up, Ltd., Ross Stores, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21023671 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Meridian Textiles Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Meridian Textiles Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meridian Textiles, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE STEP UP LTD. A NEW YORK CORPORATION AKA KIDZ CONCEPTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard S Han