This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2018 at 07:30:59 (UTC).

Mengesha v. Bitconnect International PLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Mengesha filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bitconnect International PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart, Robin L. Rosenberg and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:18-CV-81329

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judges

Robin L. Rosenberg

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BitConnect Investor Group

Co-Lead Counsel

Patricia Mengesha

Liaison Counsel

Defendants

Bitconnect LTD

Bitconnect International PLC

Bitconnect Trading LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Genevieve M. Zimmerman

Attorney at Meshbesher & Spence

1616 Park Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55404

Robert K. Shelquist

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Rebecca A. Peterson

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave. S., Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Russell M. Spence, Jr.

Attorney at Parker Daniels Kibort LLC

888 Colwell Building, 123 North Third Street

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#33

31 #1

*Restricted*

#31

#30

#27

#24

7 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#7

6 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 10/26/2018. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Russell M. Spence, Jr., mailing date October 1, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rebecca A. Peterson and Robert K. Shelquist, mailing date October 1, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Genevieve M. Zimmerman, mailing date October 1, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Docket(#32) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Case transferred in from Minnesota; Case Number 0:18-cv-00279. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/27/2018.(HMN) Modified on 9/27/2018 (kt). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docket(#29) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-279 NEB/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Court is in receipt of the lead plaintiffs' unopposed motion for transfer of venue. #24 The Court will decide the motion on the parties' written submissions. No hearing will be held. (TJB) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Mengesha. Bitconnect International PLC served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018; Bitconnect LTD served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018; Bitconnect Trading LTD served on 3/22/2018, answer due 4/12/2018. (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani.(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Russell M. Spence, Jr. in Support of #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel : at date and time to be determined. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docket(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-279 WMW/SER. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5934981) filed by Patricia Mengesha. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect Trading LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell M Spence, Jr