This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 16:17:02 (UTC).

Mengesha v. Bitconnect International PLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 Mengesha filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bitconnect International PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven E. Rau and Nancy E. Brasel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven E. Rau

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patricia Mengesha

BitConnect Investor Group

Co-Lead Counsel

Liaison Counsel

Petitioners

Albert Parks

Faramarz Shemirani

Defendants

Bitconnect International PLC

Bitconnect LTD

Bitconnect Trading LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Genevieve M Zimmerman

Attorney at Meshbesher & Spence

1616 Park Avenue

Mpls, MN 55404

Rebecca A. Peterson

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave. S., Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

Robert K Shelquist

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Russell M Spence, Jr

Attorney at Parker Daniels Kibort LLC

888 Colwell Building, 123 North Third Street

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#30

#27

26 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#26

#25

#24

#23

7 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

7 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

7 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

7 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

6 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Docket(#31) Notice that the case has been transferred/extracted to the Southern District of Florida. (lmb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/27/2018.(HMN) Modified on 9/27/2018 (kt). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docket(#29) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-279 NEB/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Court is in receipt of the lead plaintiffs' unopposed motion for transfer of venue. #24 The Court will decide the motion on the parties' written submissions. No hearing will be held. (TJB) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Date and time to be determined. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATUS REPORT (filed Jointly) by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Docket(#22) (Text-only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT: The parties are ordered to file a joint status report by 9/4/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/17/2018. (MME) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Mengesha. Bitconnect International PLC served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018; Bitconnect LTD served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018; Bitconnect Trading LTD served on 3/22/2018, answer due 4/12/2018. (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani.(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Russell M. Spence, Jr. in Support of #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel : at date and time to be determined. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Spence, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docket(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-279 WMW/SER. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5934981) filed by Patricia Mengesha. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect International, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bitconnect Trading LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Bitconnect LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell M Spence, Jr