This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:58:00 (UTC).

Melvin v. Bureau of Prisons

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Melvin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence R. Leonard and Arenda L. Wright Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00523

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Malcolm R.L. Melvin, III

Petersburg, VA 23804

Respondent

Bureau of Prisons

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed (SUBJECT TO DEFECT) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Malcolm R.L. Melvin, III. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (1 service copy provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) REFERRAL ORDER. This matter is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Referral Order to Petitioner. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/16/2018. Copies mailed 10/16/2018.(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Malcolm R.L. Melvin, III re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Malcolm R.L. Melvin, III re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REFERRAL ORDER. This matter is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Referral Order to Petitioner. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/16/2018. Copies mailed 10/16/2018.(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed (SUBJECT TO DEFECT) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Malcolm R.L. Melvin, III. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (1 service copy provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.