This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2018 at 08:00:54 (UTC).

MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC v. JULIANO, SR. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against JULIANO, SR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Karen M. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-12408

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC

MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC

Defendants

NICHOLAS JULIANO

JAMES F. JULIANO, SR.

JAMES JULIANO, JR.

JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC.

MY FAMILY CAR CARE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARD D. GALLUCCI, JR.

CONSTANTINE T. FOURNARIS

Defendant Attorney

MARC H. STOFMAN

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint by 2/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/12/2018. (dmr) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC H. STOFMAN on behalf of All Defendants (STOFMAN, MARC) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC. JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2017, answer due 2/5/2018; JAMES F. JULIANO, SR. waiver sent on 12/6/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on Nicholas Juliano of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on My Family Car Care, LLC c/o U.S. Corporation Agents of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on James Juliano, Jr. of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (STOFMAN, MARC) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC., NICHOLAS JULIANO, JAMES JULIANO, JR., JAMES F. JULIANO, SR., MY FAMILY CAR CARE, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#6

(#6) Amended AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CONSTANTINE T. FOURNARIS on behalf of MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC identifying Driven Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GALLUCCI, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC., NICHOLAS JULIANO, JAMES JULIANO, JR., JAMES F. JULIANO, SR., MY FAMILY CAR CARE, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

#2

(#2) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

1 #10

Exhibit EXHIBIT 10

1 #9

Exhibit EXHIBIT 9

1 #8

Exhibit EXHIBIT 8

1 #7

Exhibit EXHIBIT 7

1 #6

Exhibit EXHIBIT 6

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint by 2/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/12/2018. (dmr) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC H. STOFMAN on behalf of All Defendants (STOFMAN, MARC) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC. JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2017, answer due 2/5/2018; JAMES F. JULIANO, SR. waiver sent on 12/6/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on Nicholas Juliano of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on My Family Car Care, LLC c/o U.S. Corporation Agents of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC Return of Service on James Juliano, Jr. of Summons and Verified Complaint (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (STOFMAN, MARC) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC., NICHOLAS JULIANO, JAMES JULIANO, JR., JAMES F. JULIANO, SR., MY FAMILY CAR CARE, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Amended AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CONSTANTINE T. FOURNARIS on behalf of MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC identifying Driven Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GALLUCCI, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JNMVR ENTERPRISES, INC., NICHOLAS JULIANO, JAMES JULIANO, JR., JAMES F. JULIANO, SR., MY FAMILY CAR CARE, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8299998), filed by MEINEKE CAR CAR CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10)(GALLUCCI, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less