This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 17:45:38 (UTC).

Mehrer v. Synthes North America, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Mehrer filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Synthes North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04095

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Mehrer

Defendants

Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA)

Synthes North America, Inc

Synthes North America, Inc doing business as Synthes (USA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Jeremiah Hale

Attorney at Goosmann Law Firm

17838 Burke Street, Suite 250, ***Ecf

Omaha, NE 68118

Joel M Carney

Attorney at Goosmann Law Firm PLC

17838 Burke Street, Suite 250, ***Ecf

Omaha, NE 68118

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D Houghton

Attorney at Shuttleworth & Ingersoll

115 Third Street Se, Po Box 2107, Suite 500, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-2107

Nancy J Penner

Attorney at Shuttleworth & Ingersoll

115 Third Street Se, Po Box 2107, Suite 500, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-2107

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Synthes North America, Inc.(Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (pac). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#7

(#7) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Removed Petition by Defendant Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

6 #1

Notice of Assignment to Magistrate

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Synthes North America, Inc Notice of Service of Assignment to Magistrate (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate) (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) DOCKET Annotation: Attached to this entry is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Lori Mehrer. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/30/2018. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) LR 81 Statement by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA) (Penner, Nancy) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ksy). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Petition

1 #1

Original Notice

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Plymouth, case number LACV038665. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2822842), filed by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA). Scheduling Report due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Original Notice, #2 Petition, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Synthes North America, Inc.(Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (pac). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Answer due from Defendant Synthes North America Inc on 12/21/18: Action taken pursuant to 8 Order (kfs) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #7 Defendant's Unresisted Motion for extension of time to respond to removed petition. The Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is extended to December 21, 2018. The parties are reminded of Local Rule 7(i), the rule regarding an expedited relief request, and are encouraged to file expedited relief motions in the future when a deadline is scheduled to expire on or near the date the motion to request an extension is filed. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/06/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Removed Petition by Defendant Synthes North America, Inc (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Synthes North America, Inc Notice of Service of Assignment to Magistrate (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate) (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2018. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET Annotation: Attached to this entry is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Lori Mehrer. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/30/2018. (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LR 81 Statement by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA) (Penner, Nancy) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ksy). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Plymouth, case number LACV038665. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2822842), filed by Synthes North America, Inc. d/b/a Synthes (USA). Scheduling Report due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Original Notice, #2 Petition, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Penner, Nancy) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less