This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2018 at 07:04:52 (UTC).

MedScript Pharmacy LLC v. D&D Pharma LTC, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 MedScript Pharmacy LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against D D Pharma LTC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05663

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MedScript Pharmacy LLC

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant

D&D Pharma LTC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Daniel Roth

Attorney at Roth Fioretti LLC

311 S. Wacker, Ste 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Monica L. Thompson

Attorney at TottisLaw

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60601

Kevin Tottis

Attorney at TottisLaw

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-F

#11

(#11) D&D Pharma's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defense, COUNTERCLAIM filed by D&D Pharma LTC, LLC against D&D Pharma LTC, LLC . by D&D Pharma LTC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's unopposed motion #7 to extend time to respond to complaint is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 10/3/2018. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Tottis for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC for extension of time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

5 #1

Notice of Filing Summons Returned Executed for D&D Pharma LTC, LLC

#4

(#4) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MedScript Pharmacy LLC by Mark Daniel Roth (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR SERVICEMARK INFRINGMENT, UNFAIR COMPETITION AND FALSE DESIGNATION OR ORIGIN, COMMON LAW SERVICEMARK INFRINGMENT, STATE UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND VIOLATION OF ILLINOIS DECEPTIVE PRACTICES ACT filed by MedScript Pharmacy LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14843782. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/23/2018. This matter is set for a hearing to report on status on 10/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) D&D Pharma's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defense, COUNTERCLAIM filed by D&D Pharma LTC, LLC against D&D Pharma LTC, LLC . by D&D Pharma LTC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's unopposed motion #7 to extend time to respond to complaint is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 10/3/2018. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Tottis for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC for extension of time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MedScript Pharmacy LLC as to D&D Pharma LTC, LLC on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Summons Returned Executed for D&D Pharma LTC, LLC)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant D&D Pharma LTC, LLC. (lw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MedScript Pharmacy LLC by Mark Daniel Roth (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR SERVICEMARK INFRINGMENT, UNFAIR COMPETITION AND FALSE DESIGNATION OR ORIGIN, COMMON LAW SERVICEMARK INFRINGMENT, STATE UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND VIOLATION OF ILLINOIS DECEPTIVE PRACTICES ACT filed by MedScript Pharmacy LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14843782. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medscript Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica L. Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Tottis