This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 12:21:40 (UTC).

Medidata Solutions, Inc. v. Veeva Systems Inc. et al

Case Summary

On January 26, 2017, Medidata Solutions, Inc. (“Medidata” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Benjamin A. Yaghoubian of DLA Piper LLP, Bonnie L. Jarrett, Claudia E. Ray, Erin Quick, Joseph A. Loy, Jason M. Wilcox, Yosef J Riemer, Jordan Mitchell Heinz, Patrick Arnett, David Nelson Draper, Chris Ilardi and others of Kirkland & Ellis LLP, filed a civil action against Veeva Systems Inc., Alan Mateo, Michelle Marlborough, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo and Richard Young  (collectively, the “Former Employees,” and together with Veeva, the “Defendants”) represented by Andrea N. Sanchez, Benjamin D. Rothstein, Christa Anderson, Divya Musinipally, Elizabeth Egan, Khari J. Tillery, Laurie C. Mims, Molly C. Villagra, Reid P. Mullen, Taylor L. Reeves and others of Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP, seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with damages for the defendants’ alleged breach of contract, misappropriation of trade secrets and unfair competition. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, with Judges Lorna G. Schofield and Robert W. Lehrburger presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Founded in 1999, Medidata is a global SaaS company that works with the medical, pharmaceutical, and biotechnology research industry to make clinical trials better. Medidata focuses on providing innovative products and services to help its customers run better clinical trials, thereby ensuring that new treatments and therapies are made available quickly and safely to the patients who need them.”

The plaintiff alleged, “Medidata held its initial public offering (‘IPO’) on NASDAQ in June 2009. By that time, Medidata’s customer base included 22 of the top 25 global pharmaceutical companies measured by revenue and many middle-market life sciences companies. In 2009, Amgen, AstraZeneca, Johnson & Johnson, Roche and Takeda Pharmaceutical were Medidata’s largest customers measured by revenues.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant Young was the fourth of the Former Employees to join Veeva. In his role as Vice President, Global Consulting Partners, Young had access to competitively sensitive information related to Medidata’s largest and most highly strategic partners, involving some of Medidata’s largest accounts and combined sales opportunities.

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Veeva has been deliberately targeting Medidata employees is confirmed by a review of Veeva’s recent hiring patterns, which shows that a disproportionate percentage of Veeva’s hires over the last year have come from Medidata. In 2016, Veeva hired more than twice as many individuals from Medidata as it did from such other competitors as Oracle Health Sciences, Parexel and CSC Life Sciences, which likely would have been equally good sources of qualified and experienced candidates.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “By making false, fraudulent, and misleading statements to consumers, Defendant Bass Pro has deceived thousands of consumers who have purchased the Socks under the false belief that the Socks come with the purported Lifetime Warranty. Consumers have been misled, induced and defrauded into spending money on a product that cannot be replaced for any reason at any time during a consumer’s lifetime and as a result, Plaintiff and other purchasers have been harmed by Defendant’s fraudulent misrepresentations and false advertising.”

Plaintiff listed nine claims for relief, including the alleged breach of contract and fiduciary duties, violation of the Defend Trade Secrets Act, misappropriation of trade secrets, aiding and abetting breach of fiduciary duties, unjust enrichment, unfair competition and tortious interference with contractual relations.

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for declaratory and injunctive relief and an award for damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Lehrburger

Presiding Judges

Jed S. Rakoff

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medidata Solutions, Inc.

MDSOL Europe Limited

Defendants

Veeva Systems Inc

Alan Mateo

Michelle Marlborough

Sondra Pepe

Richard Young

Veeva Systems Inc.

Jason Rizzo

Not Classified By Court

Jill Johnston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin A. Yaghoubian

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bonnie Leigh Jarrett

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Chris Ilardi

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David Nelson Draper

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jordan Mitchell Heinz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (IL)

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Joseph Allen Loy

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Patrick Arnett

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Yosef J Riemer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Claudia Elizabeth Ray

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

153 East 53Rd Street

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Christa Anderson

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew T. Hambelton

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1271 Avenue Of Americas

New York, NY 10020

Divya Musinipally

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elizabeth Egan

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kevin Joseph Bruno

Attorney at Blank Rome, LLP(NJ)

301 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

Khari J. Tillery

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrea Nill Sanchez

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Benjamin David Rothstein

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Molly Caldwell Villagra

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

747 44Th St

Oakland, CA 94609

Reid P. Mullen

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

William David Williams

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. (TX)

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

1,127 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#827) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 7/15/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#826) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 7/15/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#825) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 7//14/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#824) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 7/14/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#823) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 7/13/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#822) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 7/13/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#821) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 7/12/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#820) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 7/12/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#819) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 7/11/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#818) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 7/11/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
878 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Allen Loy on behalf of Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Loy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Young, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veeva Systems Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Rizzo, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sondra Pepe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alan Mateo, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michelle Marlborough, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc..(Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michelle Marlborough, Alan Mateo, Sondra Pepe, Jason Rizzo, Veeva Systems Inc., Richard Young. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13241730)Document filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIDATA SOLUTIONS,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VEEVA SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Khari J. Tillery