This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:26:02 (UTC).

MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. GLAND PHARMA LTD.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GLAND PHARMA LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-16246

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendant

GLAND PHARMA LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD B. CALMANN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

JEFFREY S. SOOS

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY D. MILLER

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER LLP

21 Main Street, Suite 158, Court Plaza South - West Wing

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant's Application/Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission as to CHARD A. LANDMON, ESQ., DAVID K. LUDWIG, ESQ., JOSHUA S. REISBERG, ESQ., and BRENDAN D. O'CALLAGHAN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/14/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

11 #7

Certificate of Service

11 #6

Text of Proposed Order

11 #5

Declaration of Brendan D. O'Callaghan

11 #4

Declaration of Joshua S. Reisberg

11 #3

Declaration of David K. Ludwig

11 #2

Declaration of Chad A. Landmon

11 #1

Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

#11

(#11) APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Chad A. Landmon, David K. Ludwig, Joshua S. Reisberg, and Brendan D. O'Callaghan for by GLAND PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #2 Declaration of Chad A. Landmon, #3 Declaration of David K. Ludwig, #4 Declaration of Joshua S. Reisberg, #5 Declaration of Brendan D. O'Callaghan, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY D. MILLER on behalf of GLAND PHARMA LTD. (MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. GLAND PHARMA LTD. waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 2/27/2019. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#8

(#8) Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Theresa L. Burnett, Chief Deputy on 11/20/2018. (lm2, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#7

(#7) Application for Refund of Fees from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. Regarding Duplicate Charge for Complaint Filing Fee (finance notified).. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Medicure Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant's Application/Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission as to CHARD A. LANDMON, ESQ., DAVID K. LUDWIG, ESQ., JOSHUA S. REISBERG, ESQ., and BRENDAN D. O'CALLAGHAN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/14/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Chad A. Landmon, David K. Ludwig, Joshua S. Reisberg, and Brendan D. O'Callaghan for by GLAND PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #2 Declaration of Chad A. Landmon, #3 Declaration of David K. Ludwig, #4 Declaration of Joshua S. Reisberg, #5 Declaration of Brendan D. O'Callaghan, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY D. MILLER on behalf of GLAND PHARMA LTD. (MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. GLAND PHARMA LTD. waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 2/27/2019. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Theresa L. Burnett, Chief Deputy on 11/20/2018. (lm2, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application for Refund of Fees from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. Regarding Duplicate Charge for Complaint Filing Fee (finance notified).. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Medicure Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GLAND PHARMA LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9178884), filed by MEDICURE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAND PHARMA LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory David Miller