This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2018 at 07:39:37 (UTC).

Medical Ventures, Inc. v. Gary et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 Medical Ventures, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gary. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00852

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Medical Ventures, Inc.

Counter Plaintiffs and Defendants

Patrick Roberson

Brent Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

William B. Wahlheim, Jr.

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C. (Birmingham Office)

1901 6Th Avenue North, 2400 Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

W. Brad English

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

655 Gallatin Street, Sw

Huntsville, AL 35801

Matthew Stiles

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C. (Birmingham Office)

1901 6Th Avenue North, 2400 Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael W. Rich

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

655 Gallatin Street, Sw

Huntsville, AL 35801

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Clarence A. Wilbon

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP (Memphis Office)

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/31/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

16 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilbon, Clarence) Modified Text on 10/31/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/30/2018)

15 #1

Exhibit 1- Letter

#15

(#15) COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint and Counterclaim against Medical Ventures, Inc., filed by Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Letter)(Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#14

(#14) COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint and Counterclaim against Medical Ventures, Inc., filed by Brent Gary.(Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Brent Gary answer due 10/26/2018; Patrick Roberson answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

12 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilbon, Clarence) Modified Text on 10/9/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Michael W. Rich Certificate of Admission

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attorney William Wahlheim sent service packets by regular mail.) (am) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilbon, Clarence) Modified Text on 10/9/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2748817), filed by Medical Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/31/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Unopposed Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilbon, Clarence) Modified Text on 10/31/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint and Counterclaim against Medical Ventures, Inc., filed by Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Letter)(Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint and Counterclaim against Medical Ventures, Inc., filed by Brent Gary.(Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Brent Gary answer due 10/26/2018; Patrick Roberson answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Clarence A. Wilbon. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilbon, Clarence) Modified Text on 10/9/2018 (am). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence A. Wilbon on behalf of All Defendants (Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medical Ventures, Inc.. (Rich, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/3/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File or to Waive Requirement to File Application Pro Hac Vice by Medical Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Michael W. Rich Certificate of Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - E-mail to W. Brad English Approving Application for Admission)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL W. Brad English, Matthew Stiles, Michael W. Rich: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/4/2018. (am) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons issued as to Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson. (Attorney William Wahlheim sent service packets by regular mail.) (am) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended and Restated Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Medical Ventures, Inc..(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • TN & AL State Bar status verified as active for W. Brad English, Matthew Stiles, Michael W. Rich, William B. Wahlheim, Jr. (am) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Brent Gary, Patrick Roberson (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2748817), filed by Medical Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarence A. Wilbon