This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2021 at 17:35:03 (UTC).

MDL 2816 IN RE: SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 MDL 2816 IN RE SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. Jones, III and Susan E. Schwab. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MD-02816

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Jones, III

Referral Judge

Susan E. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Whipkey

Richard Whipkey

Alfonso Goree

Michael A Mckinney

Kermit Cantrell

Liric Jackson

Jean Jones

Joseph Stewart

Melanie J. Roble-Mazzella

Robert Jones

Wilma Abplanalp

Barbara Ann Cantrell

Maria Isabel Meza

Nicole Crumb

Donrue Talley Brathovd

Defendants

SORIN 3T HEATER-COOLER SYSTEM

Sorin Group USA, Inc.

Livanova Deutschland GMBH

Jane Doe Corporation

Livanova PLC

141 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Senoff

Attorney at First Law Strategy Group, LL

121 S. Broad Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Paola Pearson

Attorney at Anapol Weiss

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Sol H. Weiss

Attorney at Anapol Weiss

130 North 18Th Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James L Ward, Jr

Attorney at McGowan Hood and Felder LLC

321 Wingo Way, Suite 103

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorneys

Jared B Briant

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

3200 Wells Fargo Center, 1700 Lincoln Street

Denver, CO 80203

Linda S Svitak

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Magda Patitsas

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

213 Market Street - 8Th Foor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Mark E. Gebauer

Attorney at Ecker Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

213 Market Street, Eighth Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Sarah Elizabeth Sharp

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Emily R. Bodtke

Attorney at Faegre, Baker, Daniels, LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Other Attorneys

Lisa Brener

Attorney at Brener Law Firm, LLC

3640 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70115

Khaldoun A Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup Melodia Kelly and Schoenberger APC

650 California Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108-2615

Charles G. Monnett, III

Attorney at Charles G. Monnett III & Associates

6842 Morrison Blvd, Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28211

Ellen A Presby

Attorney at The Nemeroff Law Firm

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75230

Karen A Lorenzen

Attorney at HAYES LORENZEN LAWYERS PLC

125 South Dubuque St, Suite 580

Iowa City, IA 52240

Henry G. Garrard, III

Attorney at Blasingame Burch Garrard & Ashley, PC

440 College Avenue

Athens, GA 30603-0832

Benjamin Jared Meiselas

Attorney at Geragos and Geragos APC

644 South Figueroa Street, Historic Engine Co No 28

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Ashton R. Smith

Attorney at Jones Ward PLC

1205 E. Washington Street, Suite 111

Louisville, KY 40206

Bradford M. Cohen

Attorney at Bradford Cohen Law

1132 Se 3 Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Michael C Bradley

Attorney at Pittman, Dutton & Hellums, PC

2001 Park Place North, Suite 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

200 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#439

#438

437 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 45

437 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 44

437 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 43

#437

436 #30

Exhibit(s)

434 #26

Exhibit(s)

434 #1

Exhibit(s)

419 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude

#419

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

723 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#439) ORDER re: extension of time in 18cv2379 (eo) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#438) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 11/3/20 (mw) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#437) REPLY BRIEF re #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy filed by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 43, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 45)(Briant, Jared) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#436) by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. #434 Brief in Opposition,, #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy Amended. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s))(LeClercq, Ben) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#435) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #424 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Proposed Order)(LeClercq, Ben) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#434) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #419 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Drs. William Jarvis and Chad Roy filed by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Proposed Order)(LeClercq, Ben) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#433) ORDER granting #432 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#432) Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Brenda Britt, Joseph Britt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(LeClercq, Ben) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#431) NOTICE of Appearance by Doug Schreiner on behalf of Margaret Seed (Schreiner, Doug) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#430) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-31) - It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 9/25/20 (mw) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
391 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2- RE: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2018 @ 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable John E. Jones III. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/26/2018. (ve) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Deputy Clerk to the Clerk in the District of Colorado requesting transfer of their case to the Middle District of PA pursuant to Certified MDL CTO-1 Tag Along Order filed 2/12/2018. (ve) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1)- It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Judge Jones. The action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Middle District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of February 1, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E Jones, III. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/12/18. (ve) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1- See order for further details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/8/2018. (ve) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1 - See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/8/2018. (ve) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: NOTICE TO COUNSEL: PLEASE BE ADVISED, PRO HAC VICE PETITIONS SHOULD NOT BE FILED IN THIS CASE (ve) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Svitak and Attorney Briant specially admitted under 17cv1233. (ch1) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Svitak and Attorney Briant. (ch1) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter from Deputy Clerk addresssed to multiple districts with cases to be transferred in to our MDL case. Certified Transfer Order from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel in Washington, DC attached. (sc) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER - MDL No. 2816. The actions listed in the order are transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvnia, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John E. Jones, III for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chair, of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Sarah S. Vance on 2/1/2018. (jw) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Livanova Holding USA, Inc. (f/k/a SORIN GROUP USA, INC.) is a litigant

Latest cases where Livanova PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen A Lorenzen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles G. Monnett, III