This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:14:10 (UTC).

McQueen v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 McQueen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-11822

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven McQueen

Defendant

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Zonies

Attorney at Zonies Law, LLC

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer M. Stevenson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7290615 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Steven McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zonies, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven McQueen. GlaxoSmithKline LLC waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Zonies, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • (#10) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Hearing held on 10/10/2018.(1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.(2) The Court heard updates on pending state court cases.(3) The Court heard updates on fact and expert discovery.(4) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 in light of recently issued MDL Order No. 27 Supplementing MDL Order No. 25 Related to Phase 5 Discovery and Lexecon Waivers.(5) The Court heard the parties' "science day" presentations. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara for 10:00-10:30 AM status only -- at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • (#9) NOTICE: The Court will conduct a brief status conference on 10/10/2018 beginning at 10:00 AM and concluding at 10:30 AM. Parties who intend to participate in the status conference via telephone, must use the following DIAL-IN INSTRUCTIONS: (1) the participant dial-in number is 877-876-9177 and (2) Conference ID: ZOFRAN. The operator will ask for the Conference ID when dialing in. The phone line is open at 9:45 AM. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven McQueen. GlaxoSmithKline LLC waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Zonies, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • (#7) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 9/13/2018.(1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings. (2) The Court heard updates on pending state court cases. (3) The Court heard updates on fact and expert discovery. (4) The Court heard updates on Phase 5, including the status of Lexecon waivers. Colloquies were held on the possible extension of Phase 5 deadlines and on motions to dismiss certain defense selections. The Court directed the parties to submit a proposed MDL order related to Phase 5 discovery and Lexecon waivers. (5) The Court heard updates on plaintiffs' motion to amend the master complaints and took the matter under advisement. (6) A colloquy was held on logistics for the upcoming "science day" scheduled for October 10, 2018. (7) The Court heard argument on GSK's motion for summary judgment on preemption grounds and took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE RE: 9/13/2018 9:00 AM STATUS CONFERENCE: Parties participating in the 9/13/2018 status conference scheduled to begin at 9:00 AM must use the following DIAL-IN INSTRUCTIONS: (1) the participant dial-in number is 877-876-9173 and (2) Conference ID: HEARING. The operator will ask for the Conference ID when dialing in. The phone line is open at 8:45 AM. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; McQueen v. GlaxiSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7290615 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Steven McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zonies, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.